Walker v. Department of Homeland Security
Plaintiff: Alana Walker
Defendant: Department of Homeland Security
Case Number: 1:2021cv04318
Filed: August 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Frederic Block
Referring Judge: Roanne L Mann
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alana Walker. Department of Homeland Security served on 8/12/2021, answer due 9/2/2021. (Bartels, Paul)
August 3, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 3, 2021 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Alana Walker (Bartels, Paul)
August 2, 2021 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 2, 2021 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Department of Homeland Security filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14713594 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Alana Walker. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bartels, Paul)
August 2, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Frederic Block and Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker v. Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alana Walker
Represented By: Paul Andrew Bartels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?