Igualas v. Lutheran Social Services of Metropolitan New York, Inc.
Plaintiff: Fernando Igualas
Defendant: Lutheran Social Services of Metropolitan New York, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv04343
Filed: August 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Sanket J Bulsara
Referring Judge: Eric R Komitee
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 704
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order RE-SCHEDULING ORDER: Due to a scheduling conflict the telephonic-initial conference scheduled for 10/22/2021 is adjourned to 10/29/2021 at 12:30 P.M. before Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. The parties are directed to call the toll-free number 877-336-1274. The access code is 6534420. The parties shall dial in five (5) minutes before the conference. Counsel are directed to complete the attached Rule 26(f) Report #9 and electronically file same with the Court no later than two days before 10/29/2021. Should the parties wish to adopt a plan for discovery different from the structure in the Rule 26(f) Report, they may do so only if they file a letter explaining why such a plan is appropriate in this case. Upon receipt of this email counsel shall confirm with each other of the date and time of this telephonic initial conference. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 9/21/2021. (Manson, Eddie)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: A telephonic initial conference will be held at 12:30 P.M. on 10/22/2021 before Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. The parties are directed to call the toll-free number 877-336-1274. The access code is 6534420. The parties shall dial in five (5) minutes before the conference. Counsel are directed to complete the attached Rule 26(f) Report and electronically file same with the Court no later than two days before 10/22/2021. Should the parties wish to adopt a plan for discovery different from the structure in the Rule 26(f) Report, they may do so only if they file a letter explaining why such a plan is appropriate in this case. Upon receipt of this email counsel shall confirm with each other of the date and time of this telephonic initial conference. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 8/17/2021. (Manson, Eddie)
August 16, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy M Barbetta on behalf of Lutheran Social Services of Metropolitan New York, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Barbetta, Timothy)
August 16, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Bran Caley Noonan on behalf of Lutheran Social Services of Metropolitan New York, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Noonan, Bran)
August 16, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Fernando Igualas. (Barros, Diego)
August 3, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Diego Oswaldo Barros on behalf of Fernando Igualas (aty to be noticed) (Barros, Diego)
August 3, 2021 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Neptune, Pierre)
August 3, 2021 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Neptune, Pierre)
August 3, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Lutheran Social Services of Metropolitan New York, Inc. (Neptune, Pierre)
August 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lutheran Social Services of Metropolitan New York, Inc. filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14717037 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Fernando Igualas. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Norinsberg, Jon)
August 3, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Eric R. Komitee and Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Neptune, Pierre)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Igualas v. Lutheran Social Services of Metropolitan New York, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fernando Igualas
Represented By: Diego Oswaldo Barros
Represented By: Jon L. Norinsberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lutheran Social Services of Metropolitan New York, Inc.
Represented By: Bran Caley Noonan
Represented By: Timothy M Barbetta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?