Insinga v. Frontier Airlines, Inc.
Plaintiff: Donna Insinga
Defendant: Frontier Airlines, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv04359
Filed: August 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Sanket J Bulsara
Referring Judge: LaShann DeArcy Hall
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara: A telephonic-initial conference was held on 10/01/2021, all parties were present. As discussed on the record the Courts adopt the parties' proposed rule 26(f) report. Deadlines set based on parties' submitted joint rule 26(f) report and are as follow: Completion of all fact discovery 5/10/2022; completion of expert discovery by 7/11/2022; the last date to take the first step in dispositive motion practice will be scheduled by District Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall. A telephonic-status conference will be held on 1/27/2022 at 11:00 A.M. before Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. The parties are directed to call the toll-free number 877-336-1274. The access code is 6534420. The parties shall dial in five (5) minutes before the scheduled conference. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 10/1/2021. (AT&T Log #12:30-12:40.) (Manson, Eddie)
September 29, 2021 Filing 9 Proposed Scheduling Order and Rule 26(f) Report by Donna Insinga (Applebaum, Erin)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: A telephonic-initial conference will be held at 2:30 P.M. on 10/1/2021 before Magistrate Judge Bulsara. The parties are directed to call the toll-free number 877-336-1274. The access code is 6534420. The parties shall dial in five (5) minutes before the scheduled conference. Counsel are directed to complete the attached Rule 26(f) report worksheet and electronically file same with the Court no later than two days before 10/1/2021. Should the parties wish to adopt a plan for discovery different from the structure in the Rule 26(f) report worksheet, they may do so only if they file a letter explaining why such a plan is appropriate in this case. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 8/26/2021. (Manson, Eddie)
August 24, 2021 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Frontier Airlines, Inc. (Alexander, Barry)
August 24, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Frontier Airlines, Inc.. (Alexander, Barry)
August 11, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donna Insinga. Frontier Airlines, Inc. served on 8/5/2021, answer due 8/26/2021. (Applebaum, Erin)
August 3, 2021 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Neptune, Pierre)
August 3, 2021 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Neptune, Pierre)
August 3, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Frontier Airlines, Inc. (Neptune, Pierre)
August 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Frontier Airlines, Inc. filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14718310 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Donna Insinga. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Applebaum, Erin)
August 3, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall and Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Neptune, Pierre)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Insinga v. Frontier Airlines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Insinga
Represented By: Erin R. Applebaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frontier Airlines, Inc.
Represented By: Barry S. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?