Levy et al v. Endeavor Air, Inc.
Plaintiff: Brittney Levy, Maurice Romalho and Emad Hamid
Defendant: Endeavor Air, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv04387
Filed: August 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: James R Cho
Referring Judge: Eric N Vitaliano
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Brittney Levy, Emad Hamid, Maurice Romalho. Endeavor Air, Inc. waiver sent on 8/9/2021, answer due 10/8/2021. (Schaffer, Brian)
August 5, 2021 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Neptune, Pierre)
August 5, 2021 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Neptune, Pierre)
August 4, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Eric N. Vitaliano and Magistrate Judge James R. Cho. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Neptune, Pierre)
August 4, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Dana Marie Cimera on behalf of Emad Hamid, Brittney Levy, Maurice Romalho (aty to be noticed) (Cimera, Dana)
August 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Endeavor Air, Inc. filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14723332 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Brittney Levy, Emad Hamid, Maurice Romalho. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Levy Paystub, #2 Exhibit B - Romalho Paystub, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Schaffer, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Levy et al v. Endeavor Air, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittney Levy
Represented By: Dana Marie Cimera
Represented By: Brian Scott Schaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maurice Romalho
Represented By: Dana Marie Cimera
Represented By: Brian Scott Schaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emad Hamid
Represented By: Dana Marie Cimera
Represented By: Brian Scott Schaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endeavor Air, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?