Lin v. Mayorkas et al
Plaintiff: Hua Lin
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas, Acting Director Tracy Renaud, Gregory A. Richardson and Christopher A. Wray
Case Number: 1:2021cv04401
Filed: August 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Frederic Block
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1361
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Paulina Stamatelos on behalf of All Defendants (notification declined or already on case) (Stamatelos, Paulina)
August 13, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hua Lin. Alejandro Mayorkas served on 8/13/2021, answer due 10/12/2021; Tracy Renaud served on 8/13/2021, answer due 10/12/2021; Gregory A. Richardson served on 8/13/2021, answer due 10/12/2021; Christopher A. Wray served on 8/13/2021, answer due 10/12/2021. (Bachynska, Marta)
August 5, 2021 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Neptune, Pierre)
August 5, 2021 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Neptune, Pierre)
August 5, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Neptune, Pierre)
August 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alejandro Mayorkas, Tracy Renaud, Gregory A. Richardson, Christopher A. Wray filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14725054 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -no,, filed by Hua Lin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons) (Bachynska, Marta)
August 5, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Frederic Block. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Neptune, Pierre)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lin v. Mayorkas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hua Lin
Represented By: Marta Bachynska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas
Represented By: Paulina Stamatelos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Director Tracy Renaud
Represented By: Paulina Stamatelos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory A. Richardson
Represented By: Paulina Stamatelos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher A. Wray
Represented By: Paulina Stamatelos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?