Ross v. Universal Health Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Aaron Ross
Defendant: Universal Health Services, Inc., Provo Canyon School, Justin Uale, Wendy Turnbow and Lorna Hall
Case Number: 1:2021cv04424
Filed: August 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Diane Gujarati
Referring Judge: Roanne L Mann
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2021 Filing 8 First MOTION to Request Pre-Motion Conference by Lorna Hall, Provo Canyon School, Wendy Turnbow, Justin Uale, Universal Health Services, Inc. (Campbell, Karen) Modified on 10/1/2021 to correct motion event type. (Almonte, Kelly)
September 16, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Aaron Ross. Provo Canyon School served on 9/14/2021, answer due 10/5/2021. (Isaacs, Daniel)
August 30, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Lorna Hall, Provo Canyon School, Wendy Turnbow, Justin Uale, Universal Health Services, Inc.. (Davis, Kimberly)
August 9, 2021 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. by Aaron Ross (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Provo Canyon, #2 Proposed Summons Justin Uale, #3 Proposed Summons Wendy Turnbow, #4 Proposed Summons Lorna Hall) (Isaacs, Daniel)
August 9, 2021 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
August 9, 2021 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
August 9, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons.Civil Cover Sheet.. by Aaron Ross (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Universal Health, #2 Proposed Summons Provo Canyon School, #3 Proposed Summons Justin Uale, #4 Proposed Summons wendy turnbow, #5 Proposed Summons Lorna Hall) (Isaacs, Daniel)
August 9, 2021 ***FINAL NOTICE:***The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet and Proposed Summons. Counsel is directed to forward a completed (2 Page Form)Civil Cover Sheet, answering all questions including the NY-E Division of Business Rule 50.1(d)(2) section on the second page. Please use the event Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Davis, Kimberly)
August 9, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Diane Gujarati and Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
August 9, 2021 Your proposed summons was not issued for one of the following reasons: If multiple defendants, there must me a rider attached to the summons with the name and addresses of all defendants included., Please correct and resubmit using Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Davis, Kimberly)
August 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14729512 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Aaron Ross. (Isaacs, Daniel)
August 6, 2021 Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. Please submit a completed 2 Page Form Civil Cover Sheet. This event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Davis, Kimberly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ross v. Universal Health Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Ross
Represented By: Daniel W. Isaacs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Universal Health Services, Inc.
Represented By: Karen L. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Provo Canyon School
Represented By: Karen L. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Uale
Represented By: Karen L. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Turnbow
Represented By: Karen L. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lorna Hall
Represented By: Karen L. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?