Rejhon v. The City of New York et al
Plaintiff: Richard Rejhon
Defendant: The City of New York, The City of New York Department of Transportation, The City of New York Department of Citywide Administrative Services, Henry Gutman, Lisette Camilo, Seupersaud Bharat, Kathy Walcott, Eric Dorcean, Peter Wismer and Bill DeBlasio
Case Number: 1:2021cv04510
Filed: August 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Marcia M Henry
Referring Judge: Eric N Vitaliano
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting in part #19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. All Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by 10/18/2021. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Marcia M. Henry on 09/17/2021. (Heery-Hyatt, Micaela)
September 16, 2021 Filing 19 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Seupersaud Bharat, Lisette Camilo, Bill DeBlasio, Eric Dorcean, Henry Gutman, The City of New York, The City of New York Department of Citywide Administrative Services, The City of New York Department of Transportation, Kathy Walcott, Peter Wismer. (Schaefer, Nicholas)
September 13, 2021 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard Rejhon. Kathy Walcott served on 9/8/2021, answer due 9/29/2021. (Zapata, Fausto)
September 13, 2021 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard Rejhon. Peter Wismer served on 9/8/2021, answer due 9/29/2021. (Zapata, Fausto)
September 13, 2021 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard Rejhon. Eric Dorcean served on 9/8/2021, answer due 9/29/2021. (Zapata, Fausto)
September 13, 2021 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard Rejhon. Seupersaud Bharat served on 9/8/2021, answer due 9/29/2021. (Zapata, Fausto)
September 1, 2021 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard Rejhon. Lisette Camilo served on 8/27/2021, answer due 9/17/2021; Bill DeBlasio served on 8/27/2021, answer due 9/17/2021; Henry Gutman served on 8/27/2021, answer due 9/17/2021; The City of New York served on 8/27/2021, answer due 9/17/2021; The City of New York Department of Citywide Administrative Services served on 8/27/2021, answer due 9/17/2021; The City of New York Department of Transportation served on 8/27/2021, answer due 9/17/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit NYC Law Department Notice Concerning Email Service, #2 Exhibit Email Sending Copies of Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit Proof of Service Receipt) (Zapata, Fausto)
August 17, 2021 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Lisette Camilo, Bill DeBlasio, Henry Gutman, The City of New York, The City of New York Department of Citywide Administrative Services, The City of New York Department of Transportation. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 17, 2021 Filing 12 Proposed Summons. Re #3 Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet by Richard Rejhon (Zapata, Fausto)
August 17, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Change of Office Address for Plaintiff's counsel, Fausto E. Zapata, Jr., Once the filing has been made, you must login to www.pacer.gov and update your account. (Zapata, Fausto)
August 12, 2021 Filing 10 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
August 12, 2021 Filing 9 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
August 12, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Eric N. Vitaliano and Magistrate Judge Marcia M. Henry. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
August 12, 2021 Your proposed summons was not issued for one of the following reasons: If multiple defendants, there must me a rider attached to the summons with the name and addresses of all defendants included., Please correct and resubmit using Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Davis, Kimberly)
August 11, 2021 Filing 8 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Richard Rejhon (Zapata, Fausto)
August 11, 2021 Filing 7 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Richard Rejhon (Zapata, Fausto)
August 11, 2021 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Richard Rejhon (Zapata, Fausto)
August 11, 2021 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Richard Rejhon (Zapata, Fausto)
August 11, 2021 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Richard Rejhon (Zapata, Fausto)
August 11, 2021 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Richard Rejhon (Zapata, Fausto)
August 11, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint, by Richard Rejhon (Zapata, Fausto)
August 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Seupersaud Bharat, Lisette Camilo, Bill DeBlasio, Eric Dorcean, Henry Gutman, The City of New York, The City of New York Department of Citywide Administrative Services, The City of New York Department of Transportation, Kathy Walcott, Peter Wismer filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14741368, filed by Richard Rejhon. (Zapata, Fausto)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rejhon v. The City of New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Rejhon
Represented By: Fausto E. Zapata, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of New York
Represented By: Nicholas Philip Pallesen Schaefer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of New York Department of Transportation
Represented By: Nicholas Philip Pallesen Schaefer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of New York Department of Citywide Administrative Services
Represented By: Nicholas Philip Pallesen Schaefer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Gutman
Represented By: Nicholas Philip Pallesen Schaefer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisette Camilo
Represented By: Nicholas Philip Pallesen Schaefer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seupersaud Bharat
Represented By: Nicholas Philip Pallesen Schaefer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathy Walcott
Represented By: Nicholas Philip Pallesen Schaefer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Dorcean
Represented By: Nicholas Philip Pallesen Schaefer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Wismer
Represented By: Nicholas Philip Pallesen Schaefer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill DeBlasio
Represented By: Nicholas Philip Pallesen Schaefer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?