Gregory v. Naranjo et al
Plaintiff: Dawn Gregory
Defendant: John Naranjo and Wheels LT
Case Number: 1:2021cv04641
Filed: August 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Diane Gujarati
Referring Judge: Taryn A Merkl
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: A telephonic Initial Conference will be held on 10/27/2021 at 3:30 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Taryn A. Merkl. The parties are directed to call the toll-free number (877) 336-1839. The access code is 3914302. The parties shall dial in five (5) minutes before the scheduled conference. Counsel are directed to complete the attached Case Management Worksheet and electronically file same with the Court no later than 10/20/2021. Should the parties wish to adopt a plan for discovery different from the structure in the worksheet, they may do so only if they file a letter explaining why such a plan is appropriate in this case. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Taryn A. Merkl on 9/13/2021. (Chan, Kaity)
September 6, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan Barenbaum on behalf of All Plaintiffs (notification declined or already on case) (Barenbaum, Bryan)
August 18, 2021 Filing 6 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Neptune, Pierre)
August 18, 2021 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Neptune, Pierre)
August 18, 2021 Filing 4 Civil Cover Sheet.. by John Naranjo, Wheels LT (Kohn, Allen)
August 18, 2021 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by John Naranjo, Wheels LT (Kohn, Allen)
August 18, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wheels LT (Kohn, Allen)
August 18, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by John Naranjo, Wheels LT from NYS Supreme Court, case number 515510/2020. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANYEDC-14761659) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Answer) (Kohn, Allen)
August 18, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Diane Gujarati and Magistrate Judge Taryn A. Merkl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Neptune, Pierre)
August 18, 2021 Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. Please submit a completed 2 Page Form Civil Cover Sheet. This event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Davis, Kimberly)
August 18, 2021 This case has been opened in the Eastern District of New York. If you plan to continue representing your client(s), you must be admitted to practice before this court. You must do so by applying for Pro Hac Vice or permanent admission. To apply for Pro Hac Vice admission, you must first register for an ECF login and password. Please visit the Court's website at www.nyed.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions for guidance. Once registered, you must electronically file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You must pay the required pro hac vice fee online. (Neptune, Pierre)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gregory v. Naranjo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Gregory
Represented By: Bryan Barenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Naranjo
Represented By: Allen Kohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wheels LT
Represented By: Allen Kohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?