Hoover et al v. City of New York et al
Plaintiff: Trevor Hoover, Connor Walsh and David LaFauci
Defendant: City of New York, Mayor Bill de Blasio, NYPD Commissioner Dermot Shea, NYPD Chief of Dept Terence Monahan, NYPD Officer Edward Lam, NYPD Officer David Freund, NYPD Officer R. Velez, NYPD Officer Steve Silverstein and NYPD Members John and Jane Does 1-35
Case Number: 1:2021cv04783
Filed: August 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: James R Cho
Referring Judge: Eric R Komitee
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Omar Javed Siddiqi on behalf of City of New York (aty to be noticed) (Siddiqi, Omar)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant City of New York shall answer, move or otherwise respond to the complaint by 11/30/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James R. Cho on 9/24/2021. (Grieff, Robin)
September 23, 2021 Filing 19 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by City of New York. (Ryan, Erin)
September 13, 2021 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David LaFauci, Connor Walsh, Trevor Hoover. R. Velez served on 9/3/2021, answer due 9/24/2021. (Massimi, Jessica)
September 13, 2021 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David LaFauci, Connor Walsh, Trevor Hoover. David Freund served on 9/9/2021, answer due 9/30/2021. (Massimi, Jessica)
September 13, 2021 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David LaFauci, Connor Walsh, Trevor Hoover. Dermot Shea served on 9/9/2021, answer due 9/30/2021. (Massimi, Jessica)
September 13, 2021 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David LaFauci, Connor Walsh, Trevor Hoover. Terence Monahan served on 9/9/2021, answer due 9/30/2021. (Massimi, Jessica)
September 13, 2021 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David LaFauci, Connor Walsh, Trevor Hoover. Edward Lam served on 9/9/2021, answer due 9/30/2021. (Massimi, Jessica)
September 13, 2021 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David LaFauci, Connor Walsh, Trevor Hoover. Bill de Blasio served on 9/9/2021, answer due 9/30/2021. (Massimi, Jessica)
September 13, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David LaFauci, Connor Walsh, Trevor Hoover. City of New York served on 9/9/2021, answer due 9/30/2021. (Massimi, Jessica)
August 25, 2021 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to City of New York, David Freund, Edward Lam, Terence Monahan, Dermot Shea, R. Velez, Bill de Blasio. (Please Note: Deft NYPD Members John and Jane Does 1-35 could not be served, due to lack of identify) (Galeano, Sonia) Modified on 8/25/2021 (Galeano, Sonia).
August 24, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica S. Massimi on behalf of Trevor Hoover, David LaFauci, Connor Walsh (aty to be noticed) (Massimi, Jessica)
August 24, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Gideon Orion Oliver on behalf of Trevor Hoover, David LaFauci, Connor Walsh (aty to be noticed) (Oliver, Gideon)
August 24, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Elena Louisa Cohen on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Cohen, Elena)
August 24, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Remy Green on behalf of Trevor Hoover, David LaFauci, Connor Walsh (notification declined or already on case) (Green, Remy)
August 24, 2021 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Trevor Hoover, David LaFauci, Connor Walsh (Green, Remy)
August 24, 2021 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
August 24, 2021 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
August 24, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Related Case: The Civil Cover Sheet filed in this civil action indicates a related case. (Green, Remy)
August 24, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint, by David Freund, Trevor Hoover, David LaFauci (Green, Remy)
August 24, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of New York, David Freund, Edward Lam, Terence Monahan, NYPD Members John and Jane Does 1-35, Dermot Shea, Steve Silverstein, R. Velez, Bill de Blasio filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14781033 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by David LaFauci, Connor Walsh, Trevor Hoover. (Green, Remy)
August 24, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Eric R. Komitee and Magistrate Judge James R. Cho. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hoover et al v. City of New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trevor Hoover
Represented By: Elena Louisa Cohen
Represented By: Gideon Orion Oliver
Represented By: Jessica S. Massimi
Represented By: Remy Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connor Walsh
Represented By: Elena Louisa Cohen
Represented By: Gideon Orion Oliver
Represented By: Jessica S. Massimi
Represented By: Remy Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David LaFauci
Represented By: Elena Louisa Cohen
Represented By: Gideon Orion Oliver
Represented By: Jessica S. Massimi
Represented By: Remy Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of New York
Represented By: Omar Javed Siddiqi
Represented By: Erin T. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayor Bill de Blasio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NYPD Commissioner Dermot Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NYPD Chief of Dept Terence Monahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NYPD Officer Edward Lam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NYPD Officer David Freund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NYPD Officer R. Velez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NYPD Officer Steve Silverstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NYPD Members John and Jane Does 1-35
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?