Albright v. Corporation, Inc.
Plaintiff: Catherine Albright
Defendant: Target Corporation, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv04811
Filed: August 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ann M Donnelly
Referring Judge: Robert M Levy
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy: Edward Madigan, Alice Spitz. Case management order entered. Fact discovery deadline 1/28/22. Next conference 2/1/22 at 11:00 (same access code and dial-in number)(close of fact discovery).Initial Conference Hearing held on 10/14/2021 (Levy, Robert)
September 16, 2021 Filing 7 Proposed Scheduling Order Initial Conference Questionnaire for Judge Levy by Target Corporation, Inc. (Spitz, Alice)
September 7, 2021 Filing 6 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Catherine Albright (Madigan, Edward)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER: An initial conference by telephone has been scheduled for October 14, 2021 at 12:30 p.m., before the Honorable Robert M. Levy, United States Magistrate Judge at (888) 684-8852; Access Code #: 6223489. All counsel must be available. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to confirm with defendant's counsel that all necessary participants are aware of this conferenceOrdered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 9/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 IC Questionnaire, #2 Individual Rules) (Marino, Janine)
September 1, 2021 Filing 4 VERIFIED ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Target Corporation, Inc.. (Spitz, Alice)
August 26, 2021 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 26, 2021 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 26, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Target Corporation, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANYEDC-14785746) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B) (Spitz, Alice)
August 26, 2021 This case has been opened in the Eastern District of New York. If you plan to continue representing your client(s), you must be admitted to practice before this court. You must do so by applying for Pro Hac Vice or permanent admission. To apply for Pro Hac Vice admission, you must first register for an ECF login and password. Please visit the Court's website at www.nyed.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions for guidance. Once registered, you must electronically file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You must pay the required pro hac vice fee online. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 26, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Ann M Donnelly and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Albright v. Corporation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Albright
Represented By: Edward Joseph Madigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corporation, Inc.
Represented By: Alice Spitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?