Davis v. de Blasio et al
Plaintiff: Toni Marie Davis
Defendant: Mayor Bill de Blasio and City of New York
Case Number: 1:2021cv04853
Filed: August 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lois Bloom
Referring Judge: Kiyo A Matsumoto
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2021 Filing 5 CLERK'S JUDGMENT: ORDERED and ADJUDGED that Plaintiff's complaint is dismissed without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction due to Plaintiffs lack of standing, See Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(h)(3); 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B); that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith; and that in forma pauperis status is denied for purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). Ordered by Jalitza Poveda, Deputy Clerk on behalf of Douglas C. Palmer, Clerk of Court on 10/5/2021. (Tavarez, Jennifer)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: For the reasons set forth in the attached Memorandum & Order, plaintiff's complaint is dismissed without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction due to plaintiff's lack of standing. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(h)(3); 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B). The court certifies pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to enter judgment, close this case, send a copy of this Order and the judgment to plaintiff, and note service on the docket. Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 10/4/2021. (Tran, Alexander)
August 27, 2021 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 23, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Toni Marie Davis. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of New York, Bill de Blasio, filed by Toni Marie Davis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bowens, Priscilla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. de Blasio et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Toni Marie Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayor Bill de Blasio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?