Rozon v. Metro PCS et al
Plaintiff: Rocio Rozon
Defendant: Metro PCS, John Does 1-10 and XYZ Corp. 1-10
Case Number: 1:2021cv05046
Filed: September 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Marcia M Henry
Referring Judge: Kiyo A Matsumoto
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2021 Filing 8 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT It appearing from the docket maintained in this action that defendant Metro PCS has failed to appear or otherwise defend this action, the default of defendant Metro PCS is hereby noted pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Poveda, J.)
October 25, 2021 Filing 7 Request for Certificate of Default by Rocio Rozon (Hyderally, Ty)
October 8, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rocio Rozon. Metro PCS served on 9/29/2021, answer due 10/20/2021. (Hyderally, Ty)
September 14, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Metro PCS. (Tavarez, Jennifer)
September 10, 2021 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Rocio Rozon (Hyderally, Ty)
September 10, 2021 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
September 10, 2021 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
September 10, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto and Magistrate Judge Marcia M. Henry. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
September 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Does 1-10, Metro PCS, XYZ Corp. 1-10 filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14823442 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Rocio Rozon. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hyderally, Ty)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rozon v. Metro PCS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rocio Rozon
Represented By: Ty Hyderally
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metro PCS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Corp. 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?