Breakaa v. Mayorkas et al
Plaintiff: Amr T. Breakaa
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas, Tracy Renaud and Merrick B Garland
Case Number: 1:2021cv05233
Filed: September 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: LaShann DeArcy Hall
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 0701 jr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER: Defendants' motion for an extension #9 to respond to the Complaint is GRANTED. Defendants are directed to file their answer or move with respect to the Complaint #1 by March 31, 2022. Ordered by Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall on 11/4/2021. (Williams, Erica)
October 22, 2021 Filing 9 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, , on Consent, by Merrick B Garland, Alejandro Mayorkas, Tracy Renaud. (Dickman, Mary)
September 26, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary M. Dickman on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Dickman, Mary)
September 20, 2021 Filing 7 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
September 20, 2021 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:21-cv-02211. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 20, 2021 The case of Breakaa v. Mayorkas et al, has been transferred from District of Columbia to the Eastern District of New York. The new case number is 21cv5233. PLEASE NOTE: if you plan to continue representing your client(s), you must be admitted to practice before this court. You must do so by applying for Pro Hac Vice or permanent admission. To apply for Pro Hac Vice admission, you must first register for an ECF login and password. Please visit the Court's website at www.nyed.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions for guidance. Once registered, you must electronically file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You must pay the required pro hac vice fee online. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Defendants' Consent Motion to Transfer Case and for Extension of Time. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 8/31/2021. (lcrc1) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 9/20/2021.]
August 31, 2021 Filing 4 Consent MOTION to Transfer Case to the Eastern District of New York, Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint by MERRICK B. GARLAND, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, TRACY RENAUD. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walker, Johnny) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 9/20/2021.]
August 31, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Johnny Hillary Walker, III on behalf of All Defendants (Walker, Johnny) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 9/20/2021.]
August 19, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to MERRICK B. GARLAND, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, TRACY RENAUD, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 9/20/2021.]
August 19, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS against MERRICK B. GARLAND, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, TRACY RENAUD ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8678601) filed by AMR T BREAKAA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A, #2 Exhibit EXHIBIT B, #3 Summons SUMMONS ATT GEN, #4 Summons SUMMONS MAYORKAS, #5 Summons SUMMONS RENAUD, #6 Summons SUMMONS US ATT, #7 Civil Cover Sheet CIVIL COVER SHEET)(Jeelani, Hashim) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 9/20/2021.]
August 19, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (adh, ) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 9/20/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Breakaa v. Mayorkas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amr T. Breakaa
Represented By: Hashim G. Jeelani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas
Represented By: Johnny Hillary Walker, III
Represented By: Mary M. Dickman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy Renaud
Represented By: Johnny Hillary Walker, III
Represented By: Mary M. Dickman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrick B Garland
Represented By: Johnny Hillary Walker, III
Represented By: Mary M. Dickman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?