DeMeo v. St. John's University et al
Plaintiff: Steven DeMeo
Defendant: St. John's University and Mike Anderson
Case Number: 1:2021cv05286
Filed: September 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: LaShann DeArcy Hall
Referring Judge: Peggy Kuo
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 754
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2021 Filing 12 Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference Scheduled for December 28, 2021 by Mike Anderson, St. John's University. (Gross, Barbara)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #12 Motion to Adjourn Conference. The Initial Conference by telephone is adjourned to January 20, 2022 at 10:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. The parties are directed to call toll free (877) 336-1274 and input the Access Code 1453850 at the time of the Conference. No additional security code is needed. Once all parties are on the line, the call will be connected. (The parties are reminded that, pursuant to Local Civil Rule 1.8, they may not independently record any court proceedings. A transcript of the proceedings may be ordered from the Clerk's Office.) By January 14, 2022, the parties must file a joint and completed copy of the Proposed Discovery Plan, a PDF version of which may be found at: # https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/PK-discovplan.pdf. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 11/10/2021. (O'Neil-Berven, Ryan)
November 1, 2021 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by St. John's University (Gross, Barbara)
November 1, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Mike Anderson, St. John's University. (Gross, Barbara)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for Defendants Mike Anderson and St. John's University to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to November 1, 2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 10/12/2021. (O'Neil-Berven, Ryan)
October 8, 2021 Filing 9 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Mike Anderson, St. John's University. (Gross, Barbara)
October 8, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Barbara A. Gross on behalf of Mike Anderson, St. John's University (aty to be noticed) (Gross, Barbara)
October 8, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Ivie A. Serioux on behalf of Mike Anderson, St. John's University (aty to be noticed) (Serioux, Ivie)
September 29, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Renan F. Varghese on behalf of Steven DeMeo (aty to be noticed) (Varghese, Renan)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference will be held by telephone in this case on December 28, 2021 at 10:30 a.m. before Peggy Kuo, United States Magistrate Judge. All counsel are required to attend. The parties are directed to call toll free (877) 336-1274 and input the Access Code 1453850 at the time of the Conference. No additional security code is needed. Once all parties are on the line, the call will be connected. (The parties are reminded that, pursuant to Local Civil Rule 1.8, they may not independently record any court proceedings. A transcript of the proceedings may be ordered from the Clerk's Office.)Counsel are directed to the annexed Initial Conference Order for instructions. By December 23, 2021, the parties must file a joint and completed copy of the Proposed Discovery Plan, a PDF version of which may be found at: # https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/PK-discovplan.pdf Any request for adjournment of this or any other conference must be made in writing on notice to opposing parties, and must disclose whether or not all parties consent. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least two (2) business days before the scheduled conference, except in the event of an emergency. Counsel with knowledge and authority must be present. Per diem counsel may not appear without prior permission of the Court. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to ensure that Defendants are aware of this conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 9/23/2021. (O'Neil-Berven, Ryan)
September 23, 2021 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Neptune, Pierre)
September 23, 2021 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Neptune, Pierre)
September 23, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Mike Anderson, St. John's University. (Neptune, Pierre)
September 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mike Anderson, St. John's University filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14864703 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Steven DeMeo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons) (Gottlieb, David)
September 23, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall and Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Neptune, Pierre)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DeMeo v. St. John's University et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven DeMeo
Represented By: David Evan Gottlieb
Represented By: Renan F. Varghese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. John's University
Represented By: Barbara A. Gross
Represented By: Ivie A. Serioux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Anderson
Represented By: Barbara A. Gross
Represented By: Ivie A. Serioux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?