United States of America v. City of New York et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: City of New York and New York City Department of Education
Case Number: 1:2021cv05338
Filed: September 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Pamela K Chen
Referring Judge: Cheryl L Pollak
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Consent Judgment. See attached for further details. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 11/24/2021. (Mahkamova, Shirin)
November 23, 2021 Filing 9 Letter Attaching Refiled Consent Judgment with Supplemental Signature by City of New York, New York City Department of Education (Attachments: #1 Proposed Judgment Refiled Consent Judgment with Supplemental Signature) (Meltzer, Hilary)
November 23, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Hilary M Meltzer on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Meltzer, Hilary)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER: The Court is in receipt of the #8 Notice of Appearance filed on behalf of Defendants. The Court notes that attorney Hilary M. Meltzer is not a signatory to the #2 Consent Judgement. The Court cannot approve the Consent Judgement where the signatory for the agreement does not appear on the record. Accordingly, the Court directs counsel for Defendants who signed the Consent Judgement to file a notice of appearance on the record by 12/3/2021. Alternatively, the parties may refile the Consent Judgement with a signature by attorney Hilary M. Meltzer by 12/3/2021. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 11/23/2021. (Mahkamova, Shirin)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Plaintiff's #7 Motion to Approve Consent Judgment. Counsel for Defendants City of New York and New York City Department of Education is directed to file a notice of appearance on the record by 11/26/2021. Once counsel for Defendants files the notice of appearance, the Court will approve the #2 Consent Judgment. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 11/17/2021. (Mahkamova, Shirin)
November 15, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Unopposed Motion to Enter the Consent Judgment) (Silverman, Matthew)
September 27, 2021 Filing 6 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Neptune, Pierre)
September 27, 2021 Filing 5 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Neptune, Pierre)
September 27, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to City of New York, New York City Department of Education. (Neptune, Pierre)
September 27, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Settlement Notice of Lodging of Proposed Consent Judgment, Subject to Public Comment Period by United States by United States of America (Silverman, Matthew)
September 27, 2021 Filing 2 SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT Proposed Consent Judgment, Subject to Public Comment Period, see Notice of Lodging filed by United States of America (Silverman, Matthew)
September 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of New York, New York City Department of Education Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons) (Silverman, Matthew)
September 27, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Pamela K. Chen and Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Neptune, Pierre)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. City of New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Matthew Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of New York
Represented By: Hilary M Meltzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Department of Education
Represented By: Hilary M Meltzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?