Bader v. Long Island Rail Road Company
Plaintiff: Robert Bader
Defendant: Long Island Rail Road Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv05399
Filed: September 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Margo K Brodie
Referring Judge: Ramon E Reyes
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45 U.S.C. ยง 51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Long Island Rail Road Company. (Muccigrosso, Andrew)
November 19, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Long Island Rail Road Company identifying Corporate Parent Metropolitan Transportation Authority, Other Affiliate MTA New York City Transit Authority, Other Affiliate MTA Staten Island Railway, Other Affiliate MTA Capital Construction, Other Affiliate MTA Bus Company, Other Affiliate MTA Bridges and Tunnels, Other Affiliate Metro-North Commuter Railroad for Long Island Rail Road Company. (Muccigrosso, Andrew)
November 2, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Bader. Long Island Rail Road Company served on 10/29/2021, answer due 11/19/2021. (Lauriello, Valerie)
September 29, 2021 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
September 29, 2021 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
September 29, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Long Island Rail Road Company. (Bowens, Priscilla)
September 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Long Island Rail Road Company filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14882849 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Robert Bader. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Lauriello, Valerie)
September 29, 2021 Case Assigned to Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie and Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bader v. Long Island Rail Road Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Bader
Represented By: Valerie J. Lauriello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Long Island Rail Road Company
Represented By: Andrew G. Muccigrosso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?