Khan v. Mercy Drive, Inc.
Plaintiff: Bibi Khan
Defendant: Mercy Drive, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv05477
Filed: October 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lois Bloom
Referring Judge: Ann M Donnelly
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER: The Court shall hold the initial conference by telephone in plaintiff's Family and Medical Leave Act ("FMLA") case on December 8, 2021 at 10:30 a.m. The parties shall call the Chambers telephone conference line at (888) 363-4734 and use the access code 4444221 promptly at 10:30 a.m. The parties shall exchange their Rule 26(a)(1) initial disclosures and file their Rule 26(f) Meeting Report with the Court by December 1, 2021. Parties are advised that they must contact each other before making any request for an adjournment to the Court. Any request for an adjournment must be electronically filed with the Court at least seventy-two (72) hours before the scheduled conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 11/18/2021. (Wilhelm, Samantha)
November 17, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Mercy Drive, Inc.. (Gorman, Elizabeth)
November 17, 2021 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mercy Drive, Inc. (Gorman, Elizabeth)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER: Defendant requests an extension of time to respond to plaintiff's complaint. ECF No. 7. As plaintiff consents, the request is granted. Defendant shall respond to the complaint by November 17, 2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 10/28/2021. (Wilhelm, Samantha)
October 27, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Alfonso D'Auria on behalf of Mercy Drive, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (D'Auria, Michael)
October 27, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth R. Gorman on behalf of Mercy Drive, Inc. (notification declined or already on case) (Gorman, Elizabeth)
October 27, 2021 Filing 7 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Mercy Drive, Inc.. (Gorman, Elizabeth)
October 27, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth R. Gorman on behalf of Mercy Drive, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Gorman, Elizabeth)
October 18, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bibi Khan. Mercy Drive, Inc. served on 10/7/2021, answer due 10/28/2021. (Hassan, Abdul)
October 4, 2021 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
October 4, 2021 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
October 4, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Mercy Drive, Inc.. (Bowens, Priscilla)
October 1, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Ann M Donnelly and Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
October 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mercy Drive, Inc. filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14895789 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Bibi Khan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Hassan, Abdul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Khan v. Mercy Drive, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bibi Khan
Represented By: Abdul Karim Hassan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mercy Drive, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth R. Gorman
Represented By: Michael Alfonso D'Auria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?