Auriemma et al v. ExxonMobil Oil Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Christina Auriemma and Theresa Eisenbach
Defendant: ExxonMobil Oil Corporation and BP Products North America Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv05508
Filed: October 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Rachel P Kovner
Referring Judge: Roanne L Mann
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2021 Filing 8 Letter to Judge Kovner by BP Products North America Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Stipulation to Adjourn Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit B: Stipulation of Discontinuance With Prejudice) (Cooperman, Jonathan)
October 22, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by ExxonMobil Oil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B (Part 1), #3 Exhibit B (Part 2), #4 Exhibit B (Part 3), #5 Exhibit B (Part 4), #6 Exhibit B (Part 5), #7 Exhibit B (Part 6), #8 Exhibit B (Part 7), #9 Exhibit B (Part 8), #10 Exhibit B (Part 9), #11 Exhibit B (Part 10), #12 Exhibit C) (Hall, Michael)
October 15, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan K. Cooperman on behalf of BP Products North America Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Cooperman, Jonathan)
October 6, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Denis Hall on behalf of ExxonMobil Oil Corporation (aty to be noticed) (Hall, Michael)
October 5, 2021 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
October 5, 2021 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
October 5, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE by BP Products North America Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal Notice of Consent of Removal (Cooperman, Jonathan)
October 5, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Rachel P. Kovner and Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
October 5, 2021 This case has been opened in the Eastern District of New York. If you plan to continue representing your client(s), you must be admitted to practice before this court. You must do so by applying for Pro Hac Vice or permanent admission. To apply for Pro Hac Vice admission, you must first register for an ECF login and password. Please visit the Court's website at www.nyed.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions for guidance. Once registered, you must electronically file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You must pay the required pro hac vice fee online. (Davis, Kimberly)
October 4, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ExxonMobil Oil Corporation ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANYEDC-14900924) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit) (Glozzy, Lauren)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Auriemma et al v. ExxonMobil Oil Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Auriemma
Represented By: Leigh Bernstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Eisenbach
Represented By: Leigh Bernstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ExxonMobil Oil Corporation
Represented By: Lauren Jane Glozzy
Represented By: Michael Denis Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP Products North America Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan K. Cooperman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?