La Vakana Grocery Corp. et al v. United States of America
Plaintiff: La Vakana Grocery Corp., a New York Corporation, Jose Benito Duran and La Vakana Grocery Corp.
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2021cv05593
Filed: October 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Pamela K Chen
Referring Judge: Roanne L Mann
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by La Vakana Grocery Corp., Jose Benito Duran. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-PS Form 3811) (Tapp, Andrew)
October 27, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by La Vakana Grocery Corp., Jose Benito Duran. United States of America served on 10/13/2021, answer due 12/13/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-PS Form 3811) (Tapp, Andrew)
October 15, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE by Jose Benito Duran, La Vakana Grocery Corp. re #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Plaintiffs' Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Tapp, Andrew)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER: In light of Plaintiff's #8 notice of withdrawal of motion for preliminary injunction, the Court terminates the pending #7 motion as moot. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 10/15/2021. (Irving, Louisa)
October 8, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Jose Benito Duran, La Vakana Grocery Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A-USDA Charge Letter, #3 Exhibit B-Final Agency Decision, #4 Exhibit C-Affidavit, #5 Exhibit A to Exhibit C-2020 Profit & Loss Statement, #6 Exhibit B to Exhibit C-2021 Profit & Loss Statement, #7 Exhibit D-2020 and 2021 Profit & Loss Statements) (Tapp, Andrew)
October 8, 2021 Filing 6 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
October 8, 2021 Filing 5 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
October 8, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 USDA summons, #2 Attorney General summons) (Bowens, Priscilla)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 10/8/2021. (LK)
October 7, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Pamela K. Chen and Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
October 7, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Z. Tapp on behalf of Jose Benito Duran, La Vakana Grocery Corp., a New York Corporation (notification declined or already on case) (Tapp, Andrew)
October 7, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-14914647. by Jose Benito Duran, La Vakana Grocery Corp., a New York Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Andrew Z. Tapp, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (Tapp, Andrew)
October 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14914576 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by La Vakana Grocery Corp., a New York Corporation, Jose Benito Duran. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons) (Tapp, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: La Vakana Grocery Corp. et al v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: La Vakana Grocery Corp., a New York Corporation
Represented By: Andrew Z. Tapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Benito Duran
Represented By: Andrew Z. Tapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: La Vakana Grocery Corp.
Represented By: Andrew Z. Tapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?