Henry v. McIntosh
Petitioner: Correction Officer Bertrand Henry and Bertrand Henry
Respondent: Donita McIntosh
Case Number: 1:2021cv06016
Filed: October 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Cheryl L Pollak
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 24, 2021 Filing 8 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Case reassigned to Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak for all further proceedings. Judge Carol Bagley Amon no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Marziliano, August)
December 22, 2021 Filing 7 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Bertrand Henry, Donita McIntosh. (Kon, Hannah)
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Petitioner is granted #2 leave to proceed in forma pauperis. The Attorney General of the State of New York or, the District Attorney of KINGS County, as attorney for respondent, shall show cause before this Court by the filing of a return to the #1 Petition, why a writ of habeas corpus should not be issued. Within sixty (60) days of this Order, (February 7, 2022) respondent shall serve a copy of a return, consisting of necessary affidavits and briefs, on the petitioner and file the original with proof of service, with the Clerk of this Court. Petitioner, within thirty (30) days of receipt by him (March 9, 2022) of a copy of the respondent's return shall file his reply, if any, with the Clerk of this Court. SO ORDERED by Judge Carol Bagley Amon, on 12/9/2021. C/mailed to Petitioner's counsel. Electronic Service upon Respondents, re: this Order to Show Cause and Petitioner's #1 Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus. (Show Cause Response due by 2/7/2022.) (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER re #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is GRANTED. So Ordered by Judge Carol Bagley Amon on November 8, 2021. (Shire, Emily)
November 1, 2021 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
November 1, 2021 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
November 1, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Carol Bagley Amon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
October 29, 2021 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, by Bertrand Henry (Kon, Hannah)
October 29, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Bertrand Henry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Kon, Hannah)
October 29, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus , filed by Bertrand Henry. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F) (Kon, Hannah)
October 29, 2021 Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. All questions *** INCLUDING the CERTIFICATION OF ARBITRATION ELIGIBILITY*** section on the second page must be answered. Please resubmit corrected Civil Cover Sheet. This event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Neptune, Pierre)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henry v. McIntosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Correction Officer Bertrand Henry
Represented By: Hannah Weisman Kon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Bertrand Henry
Represented By: Hannah Weisman Kon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Donita McIntosh
Represented By: KINGS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEYS OFFICE - GENERIC
Represented By: NEW YORK STATE ATTORNEY GENERALS OFFICE - GENERIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?