Martin v. Vice Media LLC et al
Plaintiff: John G. Martin
Defendant: Vice Media LLC and VICE Food LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv06023
Filed: October 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Sanket J Bulsara
Referring Judge: Diane Gujarati
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1330
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John G. Martin. VICE Food LLC served on 12/14/2021, answer due 1/4/2022. (Glatter, Denise)
December 15, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John G. Martin. Vice Media LLC served on 12/14/2021, answer due 1/4/2022. (Glatter, Denise)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically. Ordered by Clerk of Court on 11/2/2021. (Marziliano, August)
November 1, 2021 Filing 6 Letter MOTION for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically by John G. Martin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit) (Glatter, Denise)
October 29, 2021 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Neptune, Pierre)
October 29, 2021 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Neptune, Pierre)
October 29, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to VICE Food LLC, Vice Media LLC. (Neptune, Pierre)
October 29, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. by John G. Martin (Glatter, Denise)
October 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John G. Martin filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14981864 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by John G. Martin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons) (Glatter, Denise)
October 29, 2021 Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet.The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. All questions *** INCLUDING the CERTIFICATION OF ARBITRATION ELIGIBILITY*** section on the second page must be answered. Please resubmit Civil Cover Sheet. This event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Neptune, Pierre)
October 29, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Diane Gujarati and Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Neptune, Pierre)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin v. Vice Media LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John G. Martin
Represented By: Denise Rubin Glatter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vice Media LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VICE Food LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?