Glick v. U.S. Bank National Association
Plaintiff: Dasi Glick
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Case Number: 1:2021cv06080
Filed: November 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Robert M Levy
Referring Judge: Kiyo A Matsumoto
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2021 Filing 16 Letter to the Court Advising That the Parties Have Agreed to Remand This Action by U.S. Bank National Association (Ginzburg, Daniel)
December 22, 2021 Filing 15 Letter to the Court renewing request to remand case to state court by Dasi Glick (Pawar, Vikrant)
December 22, 2021 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Complaint against U.S. Bank National Association, filed by Dasi Glick. (Bronstein, Joshua)
December 16, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto: Pre Motion Conference held on 12/16/2021. Appearances: Vikrant Pawar, Esq., for Plaintiff; Daniel Ginzburg, Esq., for Defendant. The Court discussed the parties' disagreement regarding the amount in controversy, and adopted a briefing schedule as to Defendant's motion to dismiss. First, Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint by December 23, 2021, clearly alleging the amount in controversy so that the Court may make a determination as to subject matter jurisdiction. Defendant shall serve, but not file, its motion to dismiss on Plaintiff by December 30, 2021. Plaintiff shall serve, but not file, a response to the motion to dismiss by January 13, 2022. Defendant may serve a reply, if any, by January 20, 2022, and on that day, the parties shall file the fully briefed motion to dismiss in logical order on ECF. (Court Reporter Jennifer Thun.) (Rodriguez Armenta, Elena)
December 5, 2021 Filing 13 Letter by Vik Pawar, Esq. to the Court regarding defendant's Rule 12(b)(6) request for a conference by Dasi Glick (Pawar, Vikrant)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #7 Motion for Pre Motion Conference; finding as moot #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply; terminating #11 Motion to Remand to State Court. The Court grants defendant U.S. Bank's motion #7 for a pre-motion conference in anticipation of its motion to dismiss plaintiff Dasi Glick's Complaint; and grants plaintiff's motion #11 for a pre-motion conference in anticipation of her motion to remand to state court. To the extent plaintiff's filing at #11 constituted a motion to remand to state court, that motion is terminated without prejudice. All parties shall appear telephonically for a pre-motion conference on December 16, 2021, at 11:00 am. The parties shall dial into the conference by calling 1-888-684-8852 and entering the following access code: 1312089.Plaintiff's request for a second motion for extension of time #9 is terminated as moot. Plaintiff is ordered to file a response, if any, to defendant's #7 motion for pre-motion conference by Monday, December 6, 2021. No other extensions of time will be granted in advance of the pre-motion conference. Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 12/2/2021. (Rodriguez Armenta, Elena)
December 1, 2021 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 First MOTION to Remand to State Court or schedule a pre-motion conference filed by U.S. Bank National Association. (Ginzburg, Daniel)
November 25, 2021 Filing 11 First MOTION to Remand to State Court or schedule a pre-motion conference by Dasi Glick. (Pawar, Vikrant)
November 25, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Vikrant Pawar on behalf of Dasi Glick (aty to be noticed) (Pawar, Vikrant)
November 24, 2021 Filing 9 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendant's request for a pre-motion conference ahead of Defendant's planned motion to dismiss by Dasi Glick. (Bronstein, Joshua)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Plaintiff shall have a one week extension, until November 24, 2021, to file a response to Defendant's request for a pre-motion conference. The Court will defer the scheduling of a pre-motion conference until after Plaintiff has filed a response. Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 11/17/2021. (Rodriguez Armenta, Elena)
November 16, 2021 Filing 8 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendant's pre-motion conference ahead of motion to dismiss by Dasi Glick. (Bronstein, Joshua)
November 14, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for pre motion conference re #1 Notice of Removal Ahead of a Motion to Dismiss by U.S. Bank National Association. (Ginzburg, Daniel)
November 4, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE Designating Case To Arbitration. This case has been designated to participate in the Court Annexed Arbitration Program pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.7. The Rule requires the Clerk of Court to designate and process for compulsory arbitration "all civil cases (excluding social security cases, tax matters, prisoners' civil rights cases, and any action based on an alleged violation of a right secured by the Constitution of the United States or if jurisdiction is based in whole or in part on Title 28 U.S.C. sec. 1343) wherein money damages only are being sought in an amount not in excess of $150,000.00 exclusive of interest and costs." Damages are presumed not to be in excess of the arbitration limit unless a certification is filed in accordance with Local Civil Rule 83.7. An Arbitration Hearing will be scheduled after an Answer is filed (Credle, Rita)
November 4, 2021 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (Credle, Rita)
November 2, 2021 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto for all further proceedings. Judge Brian M. Cogan no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Ordered by Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie on 11/2/2021. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 2, 2021 Filing 5 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
November 2, 2021 Filing 4 Civil Cover Sheet.. by U.S. Bank National Association (Ginzburg, Daniel)
November 2, 2021 Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed 2 Page Form Civil Cover Sheet. Please submit a completed Second Page ( Not the Instruction) Civil Cover Sheet. This event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Davis, Kimberly)
November 2, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Brian M. Cogan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
November 2, 2021 This case has been opened in the Eastern District of New York. If you plan to continue representing your client(s), you must be admitted to practice before this court. You must do so by applying for Pro Hac Vice or permanent admission. To apply for Pro Hac Vice admission, you must first register for an ECF login and password. Please visit the Court's website at www.nyed.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions for guidance. Once registered, you must electronically file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You must pay the required pro hac vice fee online. (Davis, Kimberly)
November 2, 2021 Notice of Related Case: The Civil Cover Sheet filed in this civil action indicates a related case. (Davis, Kimberly)
November 1, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by U.S. Bank National Association identifying Corporate Parent U.S. Bancorp for U.S. Bank National Association. (Ginzburg, Daniel)
November 1, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. by U.S. Bank National Association (Ginzburg, Daniel)
November 1, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by U.S. Bank National Association from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Kings, case number 525205/2021. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANYEDC-14989411) (Ginzburg, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glick v. U.S. Bank National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dasi Glick
Represented By: Joshua Reid Bronstein
Represented By: Vikrant Pawar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Daniel Ginzburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?