Baby Brezza Enterprises LLC et al v. HousingEZ, Inc.
Plaintiff: Baby Brezza Enterprises LLC and HousingEZ, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv06279
Filed: November 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: James R Cho
Referring Judge: LaShann DeArcy Hall
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: A Telephonic-Initial Conference will be held at 3:00 p.m. on 1/18/2022 before Magistrate Judge James R. Cho. Counsel for all parties must participate. Counsel for plaintiff is directed to immediately confirm this conference date and time with defendants' counsel. Counsel are directed to complete the attached Proposed Scheduling Order and electronically file same with the Court no later than 1/14/2022. Each party is directed to call toll free (888) 808-6929 and use access code 1065334. Adjournment requests will not be considered unless made in accordance with this Court's Individual Rules. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James R. Cho on 12/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Chamber's Individual Rules) (Gillespie-Cardo, Saudia) (Main Document 12 replaced on 12/16/2021) (Gillespie-Cardo, Saudia)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants HousingEZ, Inc.(Canada) and HousingEZ, Inc.(New York) shall answer, move or otherwise respond to the complaint by 1/14/2022. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James R. Cho on 12/16/2021. (Gillespie-Cardo, Saudia)
December 15, 2021 Filing 11 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #3 Summons Issued by HousingEZ, Inc.(Canada), HousingEZ, Inc.(New York). (Chen, Yong)
December 15, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Yong Chen on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Chen, Yong)
December 6, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Baby Brezza Enterprises LLC. HousingEZ, Inc.(Canada) served on 11/24/2021, answer due 12/15/2021. (Schlesinger, Susan)
November 24, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Baby Brezza Enterprises LLC. HousingEZ, Inc.(New York) served on 11/22/2021, answer due 12/13/2021. (Schlesinger, Susan)
November 15, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Phillip Feinland on behalf of Baby Brezza Enterprises LLC (aty to be noticed) (Feinland, Robert)
November 15, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Seth H. Ostrow on behalf of Baby Brezza Enterprises LLC (aty to be noticed) (Ostrow, Seth)
November 12, 2021 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 12, 2021 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 12, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to HousingEZ, Inc.(Canada), HousingEZ, Inc.(New York). (Attachments: #1 Housing Canada summons) (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 11, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall and Magistrate Judge James R. Cho. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 11, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE by Baby Brezza Enterprises LLC (Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark) (Schlesinger, Susan)
November 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against HousingEZ, Inc. filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-15021727 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Baby Brezza Enterprises LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons HousingEZ (NY), #3 Proposed Summons HousingEZ (Canada), #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E) (Schlesinger, Susan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baby Brezza Enterprises LLC et al v. HousingEZ, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Baby Brezza Enterprises LLC
Represented By: Susan Mildred Schlesinger
Represented By: Robert Phillip Feinland
Represented By: Seth H. Ostrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HousingEZ, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?