Pollak v. Midland Credit Management, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Pollak
Defendant: Midland Credit Management, Inc. and John Does 1-25
Case Number: 1:2021cv06300
Filed: November 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Rachel P Kovner
Referring Judge: Vera M Scanlon
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Settlement by Joseph Pollak (Deutsch, Raphael)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #9 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or otherwise respond. Defendant's answer due 1/28/2022. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 12/22/2021. (Lozar, Ryan)
December 21, 2021 Filing 9 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, by Midland Credit Management, Inc.. (Jiao, Chenxi)
December 21, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Diana M. Eng on behalf of Midland Credit Management, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Eng, Diana)
December 21, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Chenxi Jiao on behalf of Midland Credit Management, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Jiao, Chenxi)
December 10, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joseph Pollak. Midland Credit Management, Inc. served on 12/8/2021, answer due 12/29/2021. (Deutsch, Raphael)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: As set forth in the attached Order, a Telephonic Initial Conference is scheduled for 2/15/22 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. The parties must complete the attached joint proposed scheduling order and file on ECF no later than 2/8/22. The parties are to call 877-336-1829 and type in the access code 3581283 for the AT&T conference bridge. Please do not use the speaker function on your phone, remember to identify yourselves every time you speak, and speak slowly and deliberately for purposes of the record. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the court. Plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of this Order on Defendant(s) and file proof of service on the docket. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 11/17/2021. (Lozar, Ryan)
November 12, 2021 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 12, 2021 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 12, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Midland Credit Management, Inc.. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Does 1-25, Midland Credit Management, Inc. filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-15025302 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -no,, filed by Joseph Pollak. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons) (Deutsch, Raphael)
November 12, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Rachel P. Kovner and Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pollak v. Midland Credit Management, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Pollak
Represented By: Raphael Deutsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Credit Management, Inc.
Represented By: Chenxi Jiao
Represented By: Diana M. Eng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?