Smigiel v. College of Staten Island et al
Plaintiff: Daniel Smigiel
Defendant: College of Staten Island, Dr. Frances Melendez and Dr. Lauren Rogers-Sirin
Case Number: 1:2021cv06323
Filed: November 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Margo K Brodie
Referring Judge: Robert M Levy
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-15192750. by Daniel Smigiel. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Altman, Keith)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the 150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 1/13/2022. (Marino, Janine)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER RE #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The motion is denied with leave to re-file with certificates of good standing. Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 1.3, an application to appear pro hac vice shall be accompanied by a certificate of the clerk of the court for each of the states in which the applicant is a member of the bar, which has been issued within thirty (30) days of filing and states that the applicant is a member in good standing of the bar of that state court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 1/7/2022. (Marino, Janine)
January 4, 2022 Filing 9 First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-15162916. by Daniel Smigiel. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Motion for PHV) (Altman, Keith)
November 16, 2021 Filing 8 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Neptune, Pierre)
November 16, 2021 Filing 7 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Neptune, Pierre)
November 16, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Neptune, Pierre)
November 15, 2021 Case Assigned to Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Neptune, Pierre)
November 15, 2021 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. by Daniel Smigiel (Altman, Keith)
November 15, 2021 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. by Daniel Smigiel (Altman, Keith)
November 15, 2021 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. by Daniel Smigiel (Altman, Keith)
November 15, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint, by Daniel Smigiel (Altman, Keith)
November 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against College of Staten Island, Frances Melendez, Lauren Rogers-Sirin filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-15030275 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -no,, filed by Daniel Smigiel. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Altman, Keith)
November 15, 2021 Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet (MISSING SECOND PAGE FORM). All questions *** INCLUDING the CERTIFICATION OF ARBITRATION ELIGIBILITY*** section on the second page needs to be answered. Please resubmit Civil Cover Sheet. (Bowens, Priscilla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smigiel v. College of Staten Island et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Smigiel
Represented By: Keith Altman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: College of Staten Island
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Frances Melendez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Lauren Rogers-Sirin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?