Main Street America Assurance Company v. Maven's Business Solutions Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Main Street America Assurance Company
Defendant: Maven's Business Solutions Group, Inc., 25 Tudor Owners Corp, PRC Management Company LLC, Upgrade Contracting Co., Inc., Everest Scaffolding Inc. and Pro Safety Services, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv06327
Filed: November 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ann M Donnelly
Referring Judge: Robert M Levy
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Main Street America Assurance Company. Upgrade Contracting Co., Inc. served on 11/26/2021, answer due 12/17/2021. (Gerber, Daniel)
December 9, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Main Street America Assurance Company. Pro Safety Services, LLC served on 11/26/2021, answer due 12/17/2021. (Gerber, Daniel)
December 9, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Main Street America Assurance Company. PRC Management Company LLC served on 11/26/2021, answer due 12/17/2021. (Gerber, Daniel)
December 9, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Main Street America Assurance Company. Maven's Business Solutions Group, Inc. served on 11/26/2021, answer due 12/17/2021. (Gerber, Daniel)
December 9, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Main Street America Assurance Company. Everest Scaffolding Inc. served on 11/26/2021, answer due 12/17/2021. (Gerber, Daniel)
December 9, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Main Street America Assurance Company. 25 Tudor Owners Corp served on 11/26/2021, answer due 12/17/2021. (Gerber, Daniel)
November 24, 2021 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Main Street America Assurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Main Street America Financial Corporation for Main Street America Assurance Company. (Gerber, Daniel)
November 16, 2021 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 16, 2021 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 16, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 15, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Ann M Donnelly and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 25 Tudor Owners Corp, Everest Scaffolding Inc., Maven's Business Solutions Group, Inc., PRC Management Company LLC, Pro Safety Services, LLC, Upgrade Contracting Co., Inc. filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-15031072 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Main Street America Assurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Complaint) (Gerber, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Main Street America Assurance Company v. Maven's Business Solutions Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Main Street America Assurance Company
Represented By: Daniel Walter Gerber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maven's Business Solutions Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 25 Tudor Owners Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRC Management Company LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Upgrade Contracting Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Everest Scaffolding Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pro Safety Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?