Mahboob v. Food First Family Project, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Sana Mahboob
Defendant: Food First Family Project, Inc., and New Start Development LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv06418
Filed: November 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: James R Cho
Referring Judge: William F Kuntz
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: A Telephonic-Initial Conference will be held at 11:30 a.m. on February 2, 2022 before Magistrate Judge James R. Cho. Counsel for all parties must participate. Counsel for plaintiff is directed to immediately confirm this conference date and time with defendants' counsel. Counsel are directed to complete the attached Proposed Scheduling Order and electronically file same with the Court no later than January 31, 2022. Each party is directed to call toll free (888) 808-6929 and use access code 1065334. Adjournment requests will not be considered unless made in accordance with this Court's Individual Rules. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James R. Cho on 1/11/2022. (Attachments: #1 Chamber's Indiviudal Rules) (Gillespie-Cardo, Saudia)
January 11, 2022 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EEOC Notice; 8/20/21) (DeSimone, Thomas)
December 27, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sana Mahboob. Food First Family Project, Inc., served on 12/21/2021, answer due 1/11/2022. (Fisher, Liane)
December 27, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sana Mahboob. New Start Development LLC served on 12/21/2021, answer due 1/11/2022. (Fisher, Liane)
November 19, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Food First Family Project, Inc.,, New Start Development LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Davis, Kimberly)
November 19, 2021 Filing 7 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
November 19, 2021 Filing 6 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
November 19, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge William F. Kuntz, II and Magistrate Judge James R. Cho. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
November 18, 2021 Filing 5 Civil Cover Sheet.. by Sana Mahboob (Fisher, Liane)
November 18, 2021 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. by Sana Mahboob (Fisher, Liane)
November 18, 2021 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. by Sana Mahboob (Fisher, Liane)
November 18, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. by Sana Mahboob (Fisher, Liane)
November 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Food First Family Project, Inc.,, New Start Development LLC filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-15043399 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Sana Mahboob. (Fisher, Liane)
November 18, 2021 Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. Please resubmit a completed (Second Page) Civil Cover Sheet. This event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Davis, Kimberly)
November 18, 2021 Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. All questions *** INCLUDING the CERTIFICATION OF ARBITRATION ELIGIBILITY*** section on the second page needs to be answered. Please resubmit Civil Cover Sheet. (Bowens, Priscilla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mahboob v. Food First Family Project, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sana Mahboob
Represented By: Liane Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Food First Family Project, Inc.,
Represented By: Thomas M. DeSimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Start Development LLC
Represented By: Thomas M. DeSimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?