The Travelers Indemnity Company v. Hiscox Insurance Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: The Travelers Indemnity Company
Defendant: Hiscox Insurance Company, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv06433
Filed: November 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Margo K Brodie
Referring Judge: Ann M Donnelly
2 Judge: Robert M Levy
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #9 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. Hiscox Insurance Company, Inc. answer due 1/21/2022. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 1/3/2022. (Marino, Janine)
December 30, 2021 Filing 9 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Hiscox Insurance Company, Inc.. (Dowgin, Laura)
December 23, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura Bea Dowgin on behalf of Hiscox Insurance Company, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Dowgin, Laura)
December 23, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER denying #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The request for extension of time to answer is denied without prejudice to renewal. Defendant Hiscox Insurance Company ("Defendant") seeks to extend the time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Defendant's answer was due on 12/14/21. Because it is seeking to extend the time to answer after the time to do so has passed, Defendant must file a motion by 12/30/2021 that explains why, under the standards set forth in Enron Oil Corp. v. Diakuhara, 10 F.3d 90, 96 (2d Cir. 1993), a belated answer is permissible, and why a default should not be entered. Liang v. Home Reno Concepts, LLC, 803 F. App'x 444, 446 n.2 (2d Cir. 2020). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 12/23/2021. (Ramirez, Alexia)
December 22, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Hiscox Insurance Company, Inc.. (Prasad, Anupama)
December 22, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Travelers Indemnity Company. Hiscox Insurance Company, Inc. served on 11/23/2021, answer due 12/14/2021. (Reid, Meg)
December 21, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Anupama Prasad on behalf of Hiscox Insurance Company, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Prasad, Anupama)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie for all further proceedings. Judge Ann M Donnelly no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Ordered by Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie on 11/22/2021. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 18, 2021 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Neptune, Pierre)
November 18, 2021 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Neptune, Pierre)
November 18, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Hiscox Insurance Company, Inc. (Neptune, Pierre)
November 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hiscox Insurance Company, Inc. filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-15044186 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -yes,, filed by The Travelers Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons) (Reid, Meg)
November 18, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Ann M Donnelly and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Neptune, Pierre)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Travelers Indemnity Company v. Hiscox Insurance Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Travelers Indemnity Company
Represented By: Meg R. Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hiscox Insurance Company, Inc.
Represented By: Laura Bea Dowgin
Represented By: Anupama Prasad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?