A.A.R. et al v. City of New York et al
Plaintiff: A.A.R. Individually and M.R.
Defendant: City of New York and New York City Department of Education
Case Number: 1:2021cv06486
Filed: November 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Frederic Block
Referring Judge: Cheryl L Pollak
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20 U.S.C. ยง 1400
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference is set for 4/14/2022 @ 10:15 AM before Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak. Initial conference will proceed via AT&T conference call. Please dial 877-336-1839 at 10:15 AM. Enter Access code: 380-1746 and security code: 21-6486. So Ordered by Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak on 1/10/2022. (Caggiano, Diana)
January 3, 2022 ELECTRONIC ORDER re #20 : Granting Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants are directed to respond to the Complaint by 2/28/2022. So Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 1/3/2022. (Henney, Scott)
December 29, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , on consent, renewed, with apology to the Court, by City of New York. (Bowe, Martin)
December 29, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , on consent, by City of New York. (Bowe, Martin)
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER: The defendants letter application #19 for an extension of time to serve and file an answer is DENIED without prejudice to re-file their application addressed to MJ Pollak who will be handling all pre-trial matters in this litigation. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 12/29/2021. (Innelli, Michael)
December 28, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Wynstelle Simone Nicholson on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Nicholson, Wynstelle)
December 20, 2021 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by M.R.. A.A.R. Individually served on 12/8/2021, answer due 12/29/2021. (Hartley, Erika)
December 20, 2021 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by A.A.R. Individually. (Hartley, Erika)
December 20, 2021 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by A.A.R. Individually. City of New York served on 12/8/2021, answer due 12/29/2021. (Hartley, Erika)
December 20, 2021 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by A.A.R. Individually. City of New York served on 12/8/2021, answer due 12/29/2021. (Hartley, Erika)
November 29, 2021 Filing 13 Summons Issued, per Amended Complaint, as to City of New York. (Brown, Marc)
November 29, 2021 Filing 12 Summons Issued, per Amended Complaint, as to New York City Department of Education. (Brown, Marc)
November 24, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by A.A.R. Individually. New York City Department of Education served on 11/24/2021, answer due 12/15/2021. (Hartley, Erika)
November 24, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by A.A.R. Individually. New York City Department of Education served on 11/24/2021, answer due 12/15/2021. (Hartley, Erika)
November 24, 2021 Filing 9 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by A.A.R. Individually (Hartley, Erika)
November 24, 2021 Filing 8 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by A.A.R. Individually (Hartley, Erika)
November 22, 2021 Filing 7 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 22, 2021 Filing 6 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 22, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to New York City Department of Education. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 22, 2021 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by A.A.R. Individually. (Hartley, Erika)
November 22, 2021 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by A.A.R. Individually (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons) (Hartley, Erika)
November 22, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint, by A.A.R. Individually (Hartley, Erika)
November 22, 2021 Notice: Re: Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. All questions *** INCLUDING the CERTIFICATION OF ARBITRATION ELIGIBILITY*** section on the second page needs to be answered. Please submit Civil Cover Sheet. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 22, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Frederic Block and Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-15049634 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by A.A.R. as mng E.S., A.A.R. Individually. (Hartley, Erika) Modified on 11/22/2021 (Bowens, Priscilla).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: A.A.R. et al v. City of New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.A.R. Individually
Represented By: Erika Louise Hartley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.R.
Represented By: Erika Louise Hartley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of New York
Represented By: Martin John Bowe
Represented By: Wynstelle Simone Nicholson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Department of Education
Represented By: Wynstelle Simone Nicholson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?