Hahn v. JetBlue Airways Corporation
Plaintiff: Spencer Hahn
Defendant: JetBlue Airways Corporation
Case Number: 1:2021cv06867
Filed: December 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Carol Bagley Amon
Referring Judge: Lois Bloom
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2022 Filing 11 Letter in response to JetBlue's letter, dated January 31, 2022 by Spencer Hahn (Giskan, Oren)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER re #10 Letter Requesting Pre-Motion Conference: A pre-motion conference on Defendant's proposed motion to dismiss will be held via telephone on March 4, 2022, at 11:00 a.m. before Judge Carol Bagley Amon. Counsel are directed to call the toll free number 888-398-2342, no later than 10:50 a.m. on March 4, 2022, and enter the access code 1840743, followed by the pound key. These proceedings will be recorded by a court reporter. The attorneys are reminded that they are not to independently record any court proceedings, pursuant to Local Civil Rule 1.8. Ordered by Judge Carol Bagley Amon on February 4, 2022. (Edelman, Zachary)
January 31, 2022 Filing 10 Letter requesting Pre-Motion Conference by JetBlue Airways Corporation (Bhimani, Riyaz)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER: Defendant requests, with plaintiff's consent, an extension of time to respond to the Complaint. ECF No. #9 . The request is granted. Defendant shall respond to the complaint by January 31, 2022. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 1/7/2022. (Yindra, Hannah)
January 6, 2022 Filing 9 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , respond or otherwise move to dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by JetBlue Airways Corporation. (Bhimani, Riyaz)
December 21, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Spencer Hahn. JetBlue Airways Corporation served on 12/20/2021, answer due 1/10/2022. (Giskan, Oren)
December 13, 2021 Filing 7 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
December 13, 2021 Filing 6 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
December 13, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to JetBlue Airways Corporation. (Bowens, Priscilla)
December 13, 2021 Filing 4 Civil Cover Sheet.. by Spencer Hahn (Giskan, Oren)
December 13, 2021 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. by Spencer Hahn, individually and on behalf of others similarly situated (Giskan, Oren)
December 13, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. by Spencer Hahn, individually and on behalf of others similarly situated (Giskan, Oren)
December 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JetBlue Airways Corporation filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-15109594 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Spencer Hahn, individually and on behalf of others similarly situated. (Giskan, Oren)
December 13, 2021 Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. All questions *** INCLUDING the CERTIFICATION OF ARBITRATION ELIGIBILITY*** section on the second page needs to be answered. Please resubmit Civil Cover Sheet. (Bowens, Priscilla)
December 13, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Carol Bagley Amon and Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hahn v. JetBlue Airways Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Spencer Hahn
Represented By: Oren Giskan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JetBlue Airways Corporation
Represented By: Riyaz Gulam Bhimani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?