Rodriguez v. Avec Drinks Co.
Plaintiff: Angel Rodriguez
Defendant: Avec Drinks Co.
Case Number: 1:2021cv06993
Filed: December 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ann M Donnelly
Referring Judge: Vera M Scanlon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER granting consent #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant's deadline to answer the Complaint or otherwise move is extended to 3/12/2022. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 2/7/2022. (Quinlan, Krista)
February 4, 2022 Filing 9 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Avec Drinks Co.. (Rao, Nandini)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: A Telephonic Initial Conference is scheduled for 3/23/2022 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. The parties are to call 877-336-1829 and type in the access code 3581283 for the AT&T conference bridge. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. The parties must complete the attached Joint Proposed Case Management Plan (CMP) and file it on ECF no later than 3/8/2022. In addition to appearing parties' submission of the CMP as directed herein, in the event that any Defendant(s) has not answered or otherwise appeared, Plaintiff(s) must also mail a copy of this Order, its attachment and the full docket to the last known mailing address(es) for such Defendant(s) and file proof on ECF by the CMP filing date. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 1/11/2022. (Lozar, Ryan)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #7 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer due 2/10/2022. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 1/7/2022. (Scully, Nicole)
January 6, 2022 Filing 7 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Avec Drinks Co.. (Rao, Nandini)
January 6, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Nandini Rao on behalf of Avec Drinks Co. (aty to be noticed) (Rao, Nandini)
January 6, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Judith A Archer on behalf of Avec Drinks Co. (aty to be noticed) (Archer, Judith)
December 20, 2021 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
December 20, 2021 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
December 20, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Avec Drinks Co.. (Bowens, Priscilla)
December 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Avec Drinks Co. filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-15129736 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Angel Rodriguez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Shaked, Dan)
December 20, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Ann M Donnelly and Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez v. Avec Drinks Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angel Rodriguez
Represented By: Dan Shaked
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avec Drinks Co.
Represented By: Judith A Archer
Represented By: Nandini Rao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?