Henry v. Campbell Soup Company
Plaintiff: Stephanie Henry
Defendant: Campbell Soup Company
Case Number: 1:2022cv00431
Filed: January 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: LaShann DeArcy Hall
Referring Judge: Peggy Kuo
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2022 Filing 19 Letter addressed to Judge Hall from Simon Franzini dated March 9, 2022 re: Response to Defendant's 3/2/22 Letter by Stephanie Henry (Franzini, Simon)
March 2, 2022 Filing 18 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference by Campbell Soup Company. (Mandelsberg, Adam)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Alexander Van Dyke is permitted to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiff Stephanie Henry. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 2/22/2022. (O'Neil-Berven, Ryan)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Zack Broslavsky is permitted to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiff Stephanie Henry. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 2/22/2022. (O'Neil-Berven, Ryan)
February 18, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander Van Dyke on behalf of Stephanie Henry (notification declined or already on case) (Van Dyke, Alexander)
February 18, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-15306866. by Stephanie Henry. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Certificate of Good Standing) (Van Dyke, Alexander)
February 18, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Zack Broslavsky on behalf of All Plaintiffs (notification declined or already on case) (Broslavsky, Zack)
February 18, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-15306277. by Stephanie Henry. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Certificate of Good Standing) (Broslavsky, Zack)
February 18, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE by Stephanie Henry re #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Certificate of Good Standing) (Franzini, Simon)
February 18, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE by Stephanie Henry re #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Certificate of Good Standing) (Jacobson, Jonas)
February 18, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-15305215. by Stephanie Henry. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing) (Franzini, Simon)
February 18, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-15305179. by Stephanie Henry. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing) (Jacobson, Jonas)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Notice having been filed at #13 , Attorney Simon Franzini is permitted to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiff Stephanie Henry. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that they receive electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 2/18/2022. (O'Neil-Berven, Ryan)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER deferring ruling on #10 and #11 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Affidavits must be notarized in order to comply with Local Rule 1.3. See # https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/NGProHacViceAffidavit.pdf. Counsel is directed to use the event titled "Notice Other" on ECF to file the revised affidavit. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 2/18/2022. (O'Neil-Berven, Ryan)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Notice having been filed at #12 , Attorney Jonas Jacobson is permitted to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiff Stephanie Henry. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that they receive electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 2/18/2022. (O'Neil-Berven, Ryan)
February 11, 2022 Filing 9 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Response to the Complaint by Campbell Soup Company. (Mandelsberg, Adam) Modified on 2/11/2022 to correct motion type (O'Neil-Berven, Ryan).
February 11, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Ross Mandelsberg on behalf of Campbell Soup Company (aty to be noticed) (Mandelsberg, Adam)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to March 2, 2022. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 2/11/2022. (O'Neil-Berven, Ryan)
February 1, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stephanie Henry. Campbell Soup Company served on 1/26/2022, answer due 2/16/2022. (Franzini, Simon)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference will be held by telephone in this case on April 28, 2022 at 10:00 a.m. before Peggy Kuo, United States Magistrate Judge. All counsel are required to attend. The parties are directed to call toll free (877) 336-1274 and input the Access Code 1453850 at the time of the Conference. No additional security code is needed. Once all parties are on the line, the call will be connected. (The parties are reminded that, pursuant to Local Civil Rule 1.8, they may not independently record any court proceedings. A transcript of the proceedings may be ordered from the Clerk's Office.) Counsel are directed to the annexed Initial Conference Order for instructions. By April 22, 2022, the parties must file a joint and completed copy of the Proposed Discovery Plan, a PDF version of which may be found at: # https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/PK-discovplan.pdf Any request for adjournment of this or any other conference must be made in writing on notice to opposing parties, and must disclose whether or not all parties consent. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least two (2) business days before the scheduled conference, except in the event of an emergency. Counsel with knowledge and authority must be present. Per diem counsel may not appear without prior permission of the Court. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to ensure that Defendant is aware of this conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 1/27/2022. (O'Neil-Berven, Ryan)
January 26, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonas Bram Jacobson on behalf of Stephanie Henry (aty to be noticed) (Jacobson, Jonas)
January 26, 2022 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Neptune, Pierre)
January 26, 2022 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Neptune, Pierre)
January 26, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Campbell Soup Company. (Neptune, Pierre)
January 25, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall and Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Neptune, Pierre)
January 25, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Campbell Soup Company filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-15226659 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Stephanie Henry. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Franzini, Simon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henry v. Campbell Soup Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Henry
Represented By: Simon Carlo Franzini
Represented By: Alexander Van Dyke
Represented By: Jonas Bram Jacobson
Represented By: Zack Broslavsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Campbell Soup Company
Represented By: Adam Ross Mandelsberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?