The Annuity, Welfare and Apprenticeship Skill Improvement & Safety Funds of the International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 15, 15A, 15C & 15D, AFL-CIO et al v. Rizzo Environmental Services Corp.
Plaintiff: The Annuity, Welfare and Apprenticeship Skill Improvement & Safety Funds of the International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 15, 15A, 15C & 15D, AFL-CIO, Central Pension Fund of the International Union of Operating Engineers and International Union of Operating Engineers Local 15, 15A, 15C & 15D, AFL-CIO
Defendant: Rizzo Environmental Services Corp.
Case Number: 1:2022cv00556
Filed: January 31, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lois Bloom
Referring Judge: Nicholas G Garaufis
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER REFERRING MOTION: Plaintiff's #9 Motion for Default Judgment is respectfully REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom for a Report & Recommendation pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(B) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b). Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 3/25/2022. (Nees, Ryan)
March 23, 2022 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Central Pension Fund of the International Union of Operating Engineers, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 15, 15A, 15C & 15D, AFL-CIO, The Annuity, Welfare and Apprenticeship Skill Improvement & Safety Funds of the International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 15, 15A, 15C & 15D, AFL-CIO re #11 Affidavit in Support of Motion,, #12 Memorandum in Support, #7 Request for Certificate of Default, #9 Notice of MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendant Rizzo Environmental Services Corp., #8 Clerk's Entry of Default, #10 Affidavit in Support of Motion,, served upon Defendant Rizzo Environmental Services Corp via express mail delivery service on March 23, 2022. (Steinberg, James)
March 23, 2022 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support re #9 Notice of MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendant Rizzo Environmental Services Corp. filed by Central Pension Fund of the International Union of Operating Engineers, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 15, 15A, 15C & 15D, AFL-CIO, The Annuity, Welfare and Apprenticeship Skill Improvement & Safety Funds of the International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 15, 15A, 15C & 15D, AFL-CIO. (Steinberg, James)
March 23, 2022 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re #9 Notice of MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendant Rizzo Environmental Services Corp. (Affidavit of James M. Steinberg, Esq.) filed by Central Pension Fund of the International Union of Operating Engineers, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 15, 15A, 15C & 15D, AFL-CIO, The Annuity, Welfare and Apprenticeship Skill Improvement & Safety Funds of the International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 15, 15A, 15C & 15D, AFL-CIO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C-1, #4 Exhibit C-2, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I) (Steinberg, James)
March 23, 2022 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re #9 Notice of MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendant Rizzo Environmental Services Corp. (Affidavit of C. Chase) filed by Central Pension Fund of the International Union of Operating Engineers, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 15, 15A, 15C & 15D, AFL-CIO, The Annuity, Welfare and Apprenticeship Skill Improvement & Safety Funds of the International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 15, 15A, 15C & 15D, AFL-CIO. (Steinberg, James)
March 23, 2022 Filing 9 Notice of MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendant Rizzo Environmental Services Corp. by Central Pension Fund of the International Union of Operating Engineers, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 15, 15A, 15C & 15D, AFL-CIO, The Annuity, Welfare and Apprenticeship Skill Improvement & Safety Funds of the International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 15, 15A, 15C & 15D, AFL-CIO. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Default Judgment, #2 Statement of Damages) (Steinberg, James)
March 23, 2022 Filing 8 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT It appearing from the docket maintained in this action that defendant Rizzo Environmental Services Corp. has failed to appear or otherwise defend this action, the default of defendant Rizzo Environmental Services Corp. is hereby noted pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Poveda, J.)
March 18, 2022 Filing 7 Request for Certificate of Default by Central Pension Fund of the International Union of Operating Engineers, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 15, 15A, 15C & 15D, AFL-CIO, The Annuity, Welfare and Apprenticeship Skill Improvement & Safety Funds of the International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 15, 15A, 15C & 15D, AFL-CIO (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Request for Certificate of Default, #2 Proposed Certificate of Default) (Steinberg, James)
March 7, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Annuity, Welfare and Apprenticeship Skill Improvement & Safety Funds of the International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 15, 15A, 15C & 15D, AFL-CIO, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 15, 15A, 15C & 15D, AFL-CIO, Central Pension Fund of the International Union of Operating Engineers. Rizzo Environmental Services Corp. served on 2/23/2022, answer due 3/16/2022. (Steinberg, James)
January 31, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Rizzo Environmental Services Corp.. (Davis, Kimberly)
January 31, 2022 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
January 31, 2022 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
January 31, 2022 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
January 31, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Rizzo Environmental Services Corp. filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-15244308 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by The Annuity, Welfare and Apprenticeship Skill Improvement & Safety Funds of the International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 15, 15A, 15C & 15D, AFL-CIO, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 15, 15A, 15C & 15D, AFL-CIO, Central Pension Fund of the International Union of Operating Engineers. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Steinberg, James)
January 31, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis and Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Annuity, Welfare and Apprenticeship Skill Improvement & Safety Funds of the International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 15, 15A, 15C & 15D, AFL-CIO et al v. Rizzo Environmental Services Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Annuity, Welfare and Apprenticeship Skill Improvement & Safety Funds of the International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 15, 15A, 15C & 15D, AFL-CIO
Represented By: James Michael Steinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Central Pension Fund of the International Union of Operating Engineers
Represented By: James Michael Steinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Union of Operating Engineers Local 15, 15A, 15C & 15D, AFL-CIO
Represented By: James Michael Steinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rizzo Environmental Services Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?