Sun v. Garland et al
Plaintiff: Yu Sun
Defendant: US Attorney General Merrick B. Garland, Alejandro N. Mayorkas and Patricia A. Menges
Case Number: 1:2022cv01559
Filed: March 22, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Nicholas G Garaufis
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1651 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Defendants' answer due 6/23/2022. So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 5/10/2022. (Lee, Tiffeny)
May 9, 2022 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , move or otherwise respond to the Complaint until Jun 23, 2022 by Merrick B. Garland, Alejandro N. Mayorkas, Patricia A. Menges. (Volpe, Christopher)
April 10, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Daniel Volpe on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Volpe, Christopher)
March 24, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Yu Sun. Merrick B. Garland served on 3/24/2022, answer due 5/23/2022; Alejandro N. Mayorkas served on 3/24/2022, answer due 5/23/2022; Patricia A. Menges served on 3/24/2022, answer due 5/23/2022. (Gu, Wei)
March 22, 2022 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
March 22, 2022 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
March 22, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Bowens, Priscilla)
March 22, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Merrick B. Garland, Alejandro N. Mayorkas, Patricia A. Menges filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-15397023 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Yu Sun. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons) (Gu, Wei)
March 22, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sun v. Garland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yu Sun
Represented By: Wei Gu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Attorney General Merrick B. Garland
Represented By: Christopher Daniel Volpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro N. Mayorkas
Represented By: Christopher Daniel Volpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia A. Menges
Represented By: Christopher Daniel Volpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?