Liu v. Garland et al
Plaintiff: Weiwei Liu
Defendant: US Attorney General Merrick B. Garland, Alejandro N. Mayorkas and Patricia A. Menges
Case Number: 1:2022cv01953
Filed: April 6, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Diane Gujarati
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1651 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 31, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2022 Filing 8 STIPULATION of Dismissal without prejudice by Merrick B. Garland, Alejandro N. Mayorkas, Patricia A. Menges (Saavedra, Daniel)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER DISMISSING CASE -- As stipulated and agreed by and between the parties in the #8 Stipulation of Dismissal filed on May 31, 2022, this action is hereby dismissed without prejudice, with each party to bear its own costs, expenses, and fees. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close this case. Ordered by Judge Diane Gujarati on 5/31/2022. (Almonte, Kelly)
April 18, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel G. Saavedra on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Saavedra, Daniel)
April 13, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Weiwei Liu. Merrick B. Garland served on 4/12/2022, answer due 6/11/2022; Alejandro N. Mayorkas served on 4/12/2022, answer due 6/11/2022; Patricia A. Menges served on 4/12/2022, answer due 6/11/2022. (Gu, Wei)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: The United States Attorney, as attorney for Defendants, is directed to show cause on or before June 7, 2022, in writing, why a #1 Writ of Mandamus should not be issued, and shall serve a copy of the response on Plaintiff, with proof of such service to the Clerk of this Court. On or before July 7, 2022, Plaintiff shall file a reply, if any, with proof of service to the Clerk of this Court. Oral argument shall be heard on July 29, 2022 at 11:00 a.m. via teleconference before Judge Diane Gujarati. The call-in information for the telephone conference is 1-877-336-1839, and the access code is 2643682. The Parties should call in to the telephone conference five minutes before the conference begins. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of any court proceeding or communication with the Court are prohibited. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions. A transcript of the proceedings may be ordered from the Clerk's Office. If any party has difficulty accessing the telephone conference, please contact chambers at Gujarati_Chambers@nyed.uscourts.gov. SO ORDERED by Judge Diane Gujarati on 04/08/2022. *** Electronic Service upon the U.S. Attorney's Office re: this Order to Show Cause and Plaintiffs #1 Complaint / Writ of Mandamus.*** (Almonte, Kelly)
April 6, 2022 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
April 6, 2022 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
April 6, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Bowens, Priscilla)
April 6, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Merrick B. Garland, Alejandro N. Mayorkas, Patricia A. Menges filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-15446072 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Weiwei Liu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons) (Gu, Wei)
April 6, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Diane Gujarati. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Liu v. Garland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Weiwei Liu
Represented By: Wei Gu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Attorney General Merrick B. Garland
Represented By: Daniel G. Saavedra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro N. Mayorkas
Represented By: Daniel G. Saavedra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia A. Menges
Represented By: Daniel G. Saavedra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?