Women of Color for Equal Justice et al v. The City of New York
Plaintiff: Women of Color for Equal Justice, Remo DELLO IOIO, ELIZABETH LOIACONO, SUZANNE DEEGAN, MARITZA ROMERO, JULIA HARDING, CHRISTINE O'REILLY, AYSE USTARES, SARA COOMBS-MORENO, JESUS COOMBS, ANGELA VELEZ, SANCHA BROWN, AMOURA BRYAN, ZENA WOUADJOU, CHARISSE RIDULFO, TRACY ANN FRANCIS MARTIN, KAREEM CAMPBELL, MICHELLE HEMMINGS HARRINGTON, MARK AYNE, CARLA GRANT, OPHELA INNISS, CASSANDRA CHANDLER, AURA MOODY, EVELYN ZAPATA, SEAN MILAN, SONIA HERNANDEZ, BRUCE REID, JOSEPH RULLO, CURTIS BOYCE, Rasheen Odom, Jessica Csepku, Joseph Saviano, Monique Morene, Edward Weber, Roseanne Mustacchia, Natalya Hogan, Georgiann Gratsley, Frankie Trotman, Mervilyn Wallen, Maria Figaro and Yulanda Smith
Defendant: The City of New York, Eric L. Adams, Department of Health and Mental Hygiene, Ashwin MD, PhD Vasan and Does 1-20
Case Number: 1:2022cv02234
Filed: April 19, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lois Bloom
Referring Judge: Eric R Komitee
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2022 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT and Notice of Amendment against All Plaintiffs, filed by Rasheen Odom, Jessica Csepku, Joseph Saviano, Monique Morene, Edward Weber, Roseanne Mustacchia, Natalya Hogan, Georgiann Gratsley, Frankie Trotman, Mervilyn Wallen, Maria Figaro, Yulanda Smith. (Saint-George Esq., Jo)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER: Defendants request, with plaintiffs' consent, an extension of time to respond to the Complaint. ECF No. #7 . The request is granted. Defendants shall respond to plaintiffs' Complaint by July 11, 2022. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 5/9/2022. (Yindra, Hannah)
May 6, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Letter Motion Requesting Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint, MOTION for Extension of Time to File Letter Motion Requesting Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Eric L. Adams, Department of Health and Mental Hygiene, The City of New York, Ashwin MD, PhD Vasan. (Rosen, Elisheva)
May 5, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Elisheva Leah Rosen on behalf of Eric L. Adams, Department of Health and Mental Hygiene, The City of New York, Ashwin MD, PhD Vasan (aty to be noticed) (Rosen, Elisheva)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 4/22/2022. (Yindra, Hannah)
April 20, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Eric L. Adams, Department of Health and Mental Hygiene, The City of New York, Ashwin MD, PhD Vasan. (Davis, Kimberly)
April 20, 2022 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
April 20, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Jo Saint-George Esq.) by Mark Ayne, Curtis Boyce, Sancha Brown, Amoura Bryan, Kareem Campbell, Cassandra Chandler, Jesus Coombs, Sara Coombs-Moreno, Suzanne Deegan, Tracy Ann Francis Martin, Carla Grant, Julia Harding, Michelle Hemmings Harrington, Sonia Hernandez, Ophela Inniss, Remo Dello Ioio, Elizabeth Loiacono, Sean Milan, Aura Moody, Christine O'Reilly, Bruce Reid, Charisse Ridulfo, Maritza Romero, Joseph Rullo, Ayse Ustares, Angela Velez, Women of Color for Equal Justice, Zena Wouadjou, Evelyn Zapata. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Davis, Kimberly)
April 20, 2022 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. :Please see Corrections made on this case (Davis, Kimberly).
April 20, 2022 NOTICE:The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. Counsel is directed to forward a completed (2 Page Form)Civil Cover Sheet, answering all questions***INCLUDING QUESTIONS 1) AND 2)a) the NY-E Division of Business Rule 50.1(d)(2) section on the second page***. Please use the event Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet (Davis, Kimberly)
April 20, 2022 PRO HAC VICE FILING FEE PAID( Jo Saint-George Esq.): $ 150.00, receipt number ANYEDC-15491489 (Davis, Kimberly)
April 20, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Eric R. Komitee and Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Motions referred to Lois Bloom. (Davis, Kimberly)
April 19, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing Fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-15489106 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by ANGELA VELEZ, OPHELA INNISS, CHRISTINE O'REILLY, SONIA HERNANDEZ, Remo DELLO IOIO, KAREEM CAMPBELL, CASSANDRA CHANDLER, Women of Color for Equal Justice, MICHELLE HEMMINGS HARRINGTON, AURA MOODY, TRACY ANN FRANCIS MARTIN, AMOURA BRYAN, CURTIS BOYCE, BRUCE REID, SEAN MILAN, JULIA HARDING, JOSEPH RULLO, ELIZABETH LOIACONO, SARA COOMBS-MORENO, SANCHA BROWN, ZENA WOUADJOU, CHARISSE RIDULFO, CARLA GRANT, AYSE USTARES, SUZANNE DEEGAN, EVELYN ZAPATA, JESUS COOMBS, MARK AYNE, MARITZA ROMERO. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Saint-George Esq., Jo) . (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/20/2022: #3 Exhibit List, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit 9, #13 Exhibit 10, #14 Exhibit 11, #15 Exhibit 12, #16 Exhibit 13, #17 Exhibit 14, #18 Exhibit 15, #19 Exhibit 16, #20 Exhibit 17, #21 Exhibit 18, #22 Exhibit 18-b, #23 Exhibit 18-c, #24 Exhibit 18-d, #25 Exhibit 19, #26 Exhibit 20, #27 Exhibit 21, #28 Exhibit 22, #29 Exhibit 23, #30 Exhibit 24, #31 Exhibit 25, #32 Exhibit 26, #33 Exhibit 27) (Davis, Kimberly). (Attachment 9 replaced on 4/25/2022) (Davis, Kimberly).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Women of Color for Equal Justice et al v. The City of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Women of Color for Equal Justice
Represented By: Jo Saint-George Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Remo DELLO IOIO
Represented By: Jo Saint-George Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELIZABETH LOIACONO
Represented By: Jo Saint-George Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUZANNE DEEGAN
Represented By: Jo Saint-George Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARITZA ROMERO
Represented By: Jo Saint-George Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JULIA HARDING
Represented By: Jo Saint-George Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTINE O'REILLY
Represented By: Jo Saint-George Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AYSE USTARES
Represented By: Jo Saint-George Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SARA COOMBS-MORENO
Represented By: Jo Saint-George Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JESUS COOMBS
Represented By: Jo Saint-George Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANGELA VELEZ
Represented By: Jo Saint-George Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SANCHA BROWN
Represented By: Jo Saint-George Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMOURA BRYAN
Represented By: Jo Saint-George Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ZENA WOUADJOU
Represented By: Jo Saint-George Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARISSE RIDULFO
Represented By: Jo Saint-George Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRACY ANN FRANCIS MARTIN
Represented By: Jo Saint-George Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KAREEM CAMPBELL
Represented By: Jo Saint-George Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHELLE HEMMINGS HARRINGTON
Represented By: Jo Saint-George Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARK AYNE
Represented By: Jo Saint-George Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARLA GRANT
Represented By: Jo Saint-George Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OPHELA INNISS
Represented By: Jo Saint-George Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CASSANDRA CHANDLER
Represented By: Jo Saint-George Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AURA MOODY
Represented By: Jo Saint-George Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EVELYN ZAPATA
Represented By: Jo Saint-George Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SEAN MILAN
Represented By: Jo Saint-George Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SONIA HERNANDEZ
Represented By: Jo Saint-George Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRUCE REID
Represented By: Jo Saint-George Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH RULLO
Represented By: Jo Saint-George Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CURTIS BOYCE
Represented By: Jo Saint-George Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rasheen Odom
Represented By: Jo Saint-George Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Csepku
Represented By: Jo Saint-George Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Saviano
Represented By: Jo Saint-George Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monique Morene
Represented By: Jo Saint-George Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Weber
Represented By: Jo Saint-George Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roseanne Mustacchia
Represented By: Jo Saint-George Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natalya Hogan
Represented By: Jo Saint-George Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Georgiann Gratsley
Represented By: Jo Saint-George Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frankie Trotman
Represented By: Jo Saint-George Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mervilyn Wallen
Represented By: Jo Saint-George Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Figaro
Represented By: Jo Saint-George Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yulanda Smith
Represented By: Jo Saint-George Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of New York
Represented By: Elisheva Leah Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric L. Adams
Represented By: Elisheva Leah Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Health and Mental Hygiene
Represented By: Elisheva Leah Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashwin MD, PhD Vasan
Represented By: Elisheva Leah Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?