Fischler v. BetMGM, LLC
Plaintiff: Brian Fischler
Defendant: BetMGM, LLC doing business as BetMGM
Case Number: 1:2022cv02503
Filed: May 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Sanket J Bulsara
Referring Judge: Kiyo A Matsumoto
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1201 Civil Rights (Disability)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER: In light of the notice of settlement #10 , the parties are directed to file a stipulation of dismissal by 7/29/2022. The initial conference scheduled for 8/26/2022 is adjourned sine die. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 6/29/2022. (Bruckner, Ian)
June 28, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Settlement by Brian Fischler (Lipsky, Douglas)
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: A telephonic initial conference will be held at 10:30 A.M. on 8/26/2022 before Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. The parties are directed to call the toll-free number 877-336-1274. The access code is 6534420. The parties shall dial in five (5) minutes before the conference. Counsel are directed to complete the attached Rule 26(f) Report and electronically file same with the Court no later than 8/22/2022. Should the parties wish to adopt a plan for discovery different from the structure in the Rule 26(f) Report, they may do so only if they file a letter explaining why such a plan is appropriate in this case. Upon receipt of this email counsel shall confirm with each other of the date and time of this telephonic initial conference.So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 5/26/2022. (Manson, Eddie)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER: The Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #8 is hereby granted. The deadline for Defendant to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to 8/8/2022. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 5/24/2022. (Bruckner, Ian)
May 23, 2022 Filing 8 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move Against or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by BetMGM, LLC. (Levin, Gabriell)
May 17, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brian Fischler. BetMGM, LLC served on 5/16/2022, answer due 6/6/2022. (Lipsky, Douglas)
May 2, 2022 Filing 6 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
May 2, 2022 Filing 5 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
May 2, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to BetMGM, LLC. (Bowens, Priscilla)
May 2, 2022 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint by Brian Fischler (Lipsky, Douglas)
May 2, 2022 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint by Brian Fischler (Lipsky, Douglas)
May 2, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BetMGM, LLC filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-15525575 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Brian Fischler. (Lipsky, Douglas)
May 2, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto and Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fischler v. BetMGM, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Fischler
Represented By: Douglas Brian Lipsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BetMGM, LLC doing business as BetMGM
Represented By: Gabriell Frances Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?