Beeks v. Community Counseling and Mediation et al
Plaintiff: Shameka T Beeks
Defendant: COMMUNITY COUNSELING AND MEDIATION d/b/a CCM MENTAL HEALTH CLINIC, Emory X Brooks and Community Counseling and Mediation doing business as CCM Mental Health Clinic
Case Number: 1:2022cv02843
Filed: May 16, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Diane Gujarati
Referring Judge: Roanne L Mann
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER denying #11 MOTION for pre motion conference and granting leave to amend -- In Plaintiff's July 5, 2022 letter in response to Defendants' motion for pre-motion conference, Plaintiff requests leave to amend the Complaint in this action. See ECF No. 12 at 3. The Court has determined that leave to amend is appropriate here, where the record does not reflect any undue delay, bad faith by Plaintiff, that amendment at this stage will result in undue prejudice to Defendants, or that amendment would be futile. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(2) (providing that "[t]he court should freely give leave [to amend] when justice so requires"); Adlife Mktg. & Commc'ns Co. v. Best Yet Mkt., Inc., No. 17-CV-02978, 2018 WL 4568801, at *1 (E.D.N.Y. Sept. 24, 2018) ("Unless there is a showing of bad faith, undue delay, futility or undue prejudice to the non-moving parties, the district court should grant leave to amend."). Plaintiff shall file her amended complaint on or before August 3, 2022, in accordance with the undersigned's Individual Practice Rules. See Individual Practice Rule I.E. Defendants' #11 Motion for pre motion conference is denied without prejudice to Defendants renewing their request after that deadline. The parties are directed to file a joint letter by July 20, 2022 indicating whether they are interested in being referred to the Eastern District of New York's court-annexed mediation program. Ordered by Judge Diane Gujarati on 7/6/2022. (Almonte, Kelly)
July 5, 2022 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference filed by Shameka T Beeks. (Morelli, Adam)
June 27, 2022 Filing 11 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference by Emory X Brooks, Community Counseling and Mediation. (Loanzon, Tristan)
June 6, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shameka T Beeks. Emory X Brooks served on 5/19/2022, answer due 6/30/2022. (Morelli, Adam)
June 6, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shameka T Beeks. Community Counseling and Mediation served on 5/19/2022, answer due 6/30/2022. (Morelli, Adam)
June 6, 2022 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Emory X Brooks, Community Counseling and Mediation. (Loanzon, Tristan)
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 6/6/2022. (LK)
June 3, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Tristan Loanzon on behalf of Emory X Brooks, Community Counseling and Mediation (aty to be noticed) (Loanzon, Tristan)
May 17, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Emory X Brooks, Community Counseling and Mediation. (Davis, Kimberly)
May 17, 2022 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
May 17, 2022 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
May 17, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Diane Gujarati and Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
May 16, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Morelli on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Morelli, Adam)
May 16, 2022 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. by Shameka T Beeks (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons) (Luke, John)
May 16, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Emory X Brooks, COMMUNITY COUNSELING AND MEDIATION d/b/a CCM MENTAL HEALTH CLINIC filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-15569104 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Shameka T Beeks. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Luke, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beeks v. Community Counseling and Mediation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shameka T Beeks
Represented By: Adam Morelli
Represented By: John C Luke, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMUNITY COUNSELING AND MEDIATION d/b/a CCM MENTAL HEALTH CLINIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emory X Brooks
Represented By: Tristan Loanzon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Community Counseling and Mediation doing business as CCM Mental Health Clinic
Represented By: Tristan Loanzon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?