Hard Chrome Solutions LLC et v. Machinery Equip. Rebuilders
Plaintiff: HARD CHROME SOLUTIONS LLC,, Frank Nicholas, Tina Leo, MACHINERY EQUIP. REBUILDERS,, U.S. GEARBOX REPAIR, A&J Machine Builders, Steve Miller, Paul Miller, Jimmy Miller, Andrew Miller, Frank Miller, Nicodemus Miller and Hard Chrome Solutions LLC
Defendant: Machinery Equip. Rebuilders
Case Number: 1:2022cv03439
Filed: June 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Roanne L Mann
Referring Judge: Eric N Vitaliano
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER denying #20 and #18 Motion for Pre Motion Conference. Upon review of the parties' submissions at #18 and #20 , the Court concludes that a pre-motion conference is unnecessary. Defendant may proceed with its motion to dismiss. The parties are directed to file a joint proposed briefing schedule by 8/12/2022. Ordered by Judge Eric N. Vitaliano on 7/27/2022. (Federowicz, Stephen)
July 26, 2022 Filing 20 MOTION for pre motion conference re #18 Letter in Response to Certain Defendants' Filing dated July 19, 2022 by Hard Chrome Solutions LLC, Tina Leo, Frank Nicholas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (MacMull, Joel)
July 26, 2022 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hard Chrome Solutions LLC. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service, #2 Affidavit of Service, #3 Affidavit of Service, #4 Affidavit of Service, #5 Affidavit of Service, #6 Affidavit of Service, #7 Affidavit of Service, #8 Affidavit of Service) (MacMull, Joel)
July 19, 2022 Filing 18 Letter Motion for Conference regarding Defendants' anticipated Motion to Dismiss by A&J Machine Builders, Machinery Equip. Rebuilders, Andrew Miller, Jimmy Miller, Paul Miller, Steve Miller, U.S. Gearbox Repair (Dayan, Albert)
July 19, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Albert Y. Dayan on behalf of A&J Machine Builders, Machinery Equip. Rebuilders, Andrew Miller, Jimmy Miller, Paul Miller, Steve Miller, U.S. Gearbox Repair (aty to be noticed) (Dayan, Albert)
June 24, 2022 Filing 16 Summons Issued as to A&J Machine Builders, Machinery Equip. Rebuilders, Andrew Miller, Frank Miller, Jimmy Miller, Nicodemus Miller, Paul Miller, Steve Miller, U.S. Gearbox Repair. (Tavarez, Jennifer) (Main Document 16 replaced on 6/24/2022) (Tavarez, Jennifer).
June 21, 2022 Filing 15 Proposed Summons. by Hard Chrome Solutions LLC (MacMull, Joel)
June 12, 2022 Filing 14 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
June 12, 2022 Filing 13 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
June 12, 2022 Your proposed summons was not issued for one of the following reasons: If multiple defendants, there must me a rider attached to the One (1)Proposed Summons with the name and addresses of all defendants included., Please correct and resubmit using Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Davis, Kimberly)
June 12, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Eric N. Vitaliano and Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
June 10, 2022 Filing 12 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by HARD CHROME SOLUTIONS LLC,, Tina Leo, Frank Nicholas (MacMull, Joel)
June 10, 2022 Filing 11 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by HARD CHROME SOLUTIONS LLC,, Tina Leo, Frank Nicholas (MacMull, Joel)
June 10, 2022 Filing 10 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Frank Nicholas (MacMull, Joel)
June 10, 2022 Filing 9 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by HARD CHROME SOLUTIONS LLC,, Tina Leo, Frank Nicholas (MacMull, Joel)
June 10, 2022 Filing 8 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by HARD CHROME SOLUTIONS LLC,, Tina Leo, Frank Nicholas (MacMull, Joel)
June 10, 2022 Filing 7 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by HARD CHROME SOLUTIONS LLC,, Tina Leo, Frank Nicholas (MacMull, Joel)
June 10, 2022 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by HARD CHROME SOLUTIONS LLC,, Tina Leo, Frank Nicholas (MacMull, Joel)
June 10, 2022 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by HARD CHROME SOLUTIONS LLC,, Tina Leo, Frank Nicholas (MacMull, Joel)
June 10, 2022 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by HARD CHROME SOLUTIONS LLC,, Tina Leo, Frank Nicholas (MacMull, Joel)
June 10, 2022 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HARD CHROME SOLUTIONS LLC,, Tina Leo, Frank Nicholas (MacMull, Joel)
June 10, 2022 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint, by HARD CHROME SOLUTIONS LLC,, Tina Leo, Frank Nicholas (MacMull, Joel)
June 10, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against A&J Machine Builders, MACHINERY EQUIP. REBUILDERS,, Andrew Miller, Frank Miller, Jimmy Miller, Nicodemus Miller, Paul Miller, Steve Miller, U.S. GEARBOX REPAIR filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-15649689 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes.,, filed by Tina Leo, Frank Nicholas, HARD CHROME SOLUTIONS LLC,. (MacMull, Joel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hard Chrome Solutions LLC et v. Machinery Equip. Rebuilders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HARD CHROME SOLUTIONS LLC,
Represented By: Joel Geoffrey MacMull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Nicholas
Represented By: Joel Geoffrey MacMull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina Leo
Represented By: Joel Geoffrey MacMull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MACHINERY EQUIP. REBUILDERS,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. GEARBOX REPAIR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A&J Machine Builders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicodemus Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hard Chrome Solutions LLC
Represented By: Joel Geoffrey MacMull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Machinery Equip. Rebuilders
Represented By: Albert Y. Dayan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?