The Annuity, Welfare and Apprenticeship Skill Improvement & Safety Funds of the International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 15, 15A, 15C & 15D, AFL-CIO et al v. New York Geomatics Inc.
Plaintiff: The Annuity, Welfare and Apprenticeship Skill Improvement & Safety Funds of the International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 15, 15A, 15C & 15D, AFL-CIO, Central Pension Fund of the International Union of Operating Engineers and International Union of Operating Engineers Local 15, 15A, 15C & 15D, AFL-CIO
Defendant: New York Geomatics Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv04124
Filed: July 14, 2022
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ann M Donnelly
Referring Judge: Cheryl L Pollak
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Cesar Augusto Fernandez on behalf of All Defendants (notification declined or already on case) (Fernandez, Cesar)
August 31, 2022 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by All Defendants. (Fernandez, Cesar)
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference is set for 10/14/2022 @ 2:15 PM before Chief Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak. Initial conference will proceed via AT&T conference call. Please dial 877-336-1839 at 2:15 PM Enter Access code: 380-1746 and security code: 22-4124. So Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 8/11/2022. (Caggiano, Diana)
August 3, 2022 Filing 6 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Central Pension Fund of the International Union of Operating Engineers, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 15, 15A, 15C & 15D, AFL-CIO, The Annuity, Welfare and Apprenticeship Skill Improvement & Safety Funds of the International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 15, 15A, 15C & 15D, AFL-CIO. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation Extending Defendant's Time to Answer the Complaint) (Steinberg, James)
August 3, 2022 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer - answer due 9/9/2022. So Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 8/3/2022. (Caggiano, Diana)
July 28, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Annuity, Welfare and Apprenticeship Skill Improvement & Safety Funds of the International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 15, 15A, 15C & 15D, AFL-CIO, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 15, 15A, 15C & 15D, AFL-CIO, Central Pension Fund of the International Union of Operating Engineers. New York Geomatics Inc. served on 7/19/2022, answer due 8/9/2022. (Steinberg, James)
July 14, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to New York Geomatics Inc.. (Davis, Kimberly)
July 14, 2022 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
July 14, 2022 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
July 14, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against New York Geomatics Inc. filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-15749079 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by The Annuity, Welfare and Apprenticeship Skill Improvement & Safety Funds of the International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 15, 15A, 15C & 15D, AFL-CIO, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 15, 15A, 15C & 15D, AFL-CIO, Central Pension Fund of the International Union of Operating Engineers. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Steinberg, James)
July 14, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Ann M Donnelly and Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Annuity, Welfare and Apprenticeship Skill Improvement & Safety Funds of the International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 15, 15A, 15C & 15D, AFL-CIO et al v. New York Geomatics Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Annuity, Welfare and Apprenticeship Skill Improvement & Safety Funds of the International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 15, 15A, 15C & 15D, AFL-CIO
Represented By: James Michael Steinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Central Pension Fund of the International Union of Operating Engineers
Represented By: James Michael Steinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Union of Operating Engineers Local 15, 15A, 15C & 15D, AFL-CIO
Represented By: James Michael Steinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York Geomatics Inc.
Represented By: Cesar Augusto Fernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?