Chambers v. Lilly
Petitioner: Jashid Chambers
Respondent: Lynn Lilly
Case Number: 1:2022cv04368
Filed: July 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lois Bloom
Referring Judge: Eric R Komitee
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT/AFFIRMATION of Mailing of Order to Show Cause by Lynn Lilly (Appelbaum, Amy)
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE -- Petitioner's motion to proceed in forma pauperis #4 is granted. Respondent shall file a complete answer or other pleading in response to the petition on or before October 24, 2022. Also by October 24, 2022, Respondent shall electronically file the state court record. Each item should be individually labeled based on the nature of the document for example, "Exhibit A - Suppression Hearing Transcript," and not "Exhibit A State Court Record." No reply is required; however, should Petitioner choose to reply, Petitioner shall file any reply to Respondent's responsive pleading on or before November 14, 2022. The Clerk of Court shall electronically serve copies of this order and petition for writ of habeas corpus upon the Attorney General of the State of New York and the District Attorney for Kings County. Respondent shall serve a copy of this order upon Petitioner, and file proof of service with the Clerk of Court, on or before September 6, 2022. ORDER ATTACHED. Ordered by Judge Eric R. Komitee on 8/25/2022. (copy mailed). (Guy, Alicia)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jashid Chambers. (Galeano, Sonia)
July 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
July 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT FILING, litigant notified of deficiency(s) that must be corrected within fourteen (14) days. Mailed out on 7/25/2022 (Davis, Kimberly)
July 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus , filed by Jashid Chambers. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Davis, Kimberly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chambers v. Lilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jashid Chambers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Lynn Lilly
Represented By: KINGS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEYS OFFICE - GENERIC
Represented By: NEW YORK STATE ATTORNEY GENERALS OFFICE - GENERIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?