The Walt Disney Company v. Visa Inc. et al
Plaintiff: The Walt Disney Company
Defendant: Visa Inc., Visa U.S.A. Inc., Visa International Service Association, MasterCard Incorporated and Mastercard International Incorporated
Case Number: 1:2022cv04489
Filed: July 29, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Margo K Brodie
Referring Judge: Vera M Scanlon
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting Stipulation of Dismissal filed by The Walt Disney Company (22-cv-04489) Ordered by Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie on 8/5/2022. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01720-MKB-VMS, 1:22-cv-04489-MKB-VMS (Valentin, Winnethka)
August 5, 2022 Civil Case Terminated. (Valentin, Winnethka)
August 3, 2022 Filing 13 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice of all Claims by The Walt Disney Company Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01720-MKB-VMS, 1:22-cv-04489-MKB-VMS (Litvack, Sanford)
August 1, 2022 Filing 12 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 1, 2022 Filing 11 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 1, 2022 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 1, 2022 Filing 9 Proposed Summons. by The Walt Disney Company (Litvack, Sanford)
August 1, 2022 Filing 8 Civil Cover Sheet.. by The Walt Disney Company (Litvack, Sanford)
August 1, 2022 Case Assigned to Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie and Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 29, 2022 Filing 7 Proposed Summons. by The Walt Disney Company (Litvack, Sanford)
July 29, 2022 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. by The Walt Disney Company (Litvack, Sanford)
July 29, 2022 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. by The Walt Disney Company (Litvack, Sanford)
July 29, 2022 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. by The Walt Disney Company (Litvack, Sanford)
July 29, 2022 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. by The Walt Disney Company (Litvack, Sanford)
July 29, 2022 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. by The Walt Disney Company (Litvack, Sanford)
July 29, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MasterCard Incorporated, Mastercard International Incorporated, Visa Inc., Visa International Service Association, Visa U.S.A. Inc. filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-15798390 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by The Walt Disney Company. (Litvack, Sanford)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Walt Disney Company v. Visa Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Walt Disney Company
Represented By: Sanford M. Litvack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Visa Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Visa U.S.A. Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Visa International Service Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MasterCard Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mastercard International Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?