Koralewski v. Blackstone Labs, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Maciej Koralewski
Defendant: Blackstone Labs, LLC, Philip Braun and Richard Newton
Case Number: 1:2022cv04751
Filed: August 12, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Sanket J Bulsara
Referring Judge: Diane Gujarati
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara: A telephonic-initial conference was held on 9/13/2022. Plaintiff's counsel (Donald A. Pitofsky) and Defendants counsel (Jack Wenik, Jessica Leach, and Zachary Taylor) were present. As discussed on the record Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint on or before 10/28/2022; defendants shall file their answer or pre-motion request by 11/28/2022. The pre-motion conference request DKT No. #6 is denied as moot. An in person status conference to discuss a discovery schedule will take place on 12/13/2022 at 11:30 A.M. in Courtroom 324N before Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 9/13/2022. (AT&T Log #2:00-2:45.) (Manson, Eddie)
September 8, 2022 Filing 13 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Taylor, Zachary)
August 31, 2022 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference in anticipation of moving to dismiss the Complaint filed by Maciej Koralewski. (Pitofsky, Donald)
August 31, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald A. Pitofsky on behalf of Maciej Koralewski (aty to be noticed) (Pitofsky, Donald)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER re: #6 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference -- Plaintiff is directed to respond to Defendants' #6 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference, as required by this Court's Individual Practice Rule III.A. Such response shall be due by September 6, 2022. Ordered by Judge Diane Gujarati on 8/30/2022. (Harris-Dyer, Sophia)
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER: The Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #8 by attorney Zachary S. Taylor is hereby granted. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerk's Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 8/26/2022. (Dikkers, Maxwell)
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER: The Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #10 by attorney Jessica Leach is hereby granted. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerk's Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 8/26/2022. (Dikkers, Maxwell)
August 25, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-15880965. by Blackstone Labs, LLC, Philip Braun, Richard Newton. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Leach, Jessica)
August 25, 2022 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re #8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-15878886. filed by Blackstone Labs, LLC, Philip Braun, Richard Newton. (Attachments: #1 NJ Certificate of Good Standing) (Taylor, Zachary)
August 25, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-15878886. by Blackstone Labs, LLC, Philip Braun, Richard Newton. (Taylor, Zachary)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: A telephonic initial conference will be held at 2:00 P.M. on 9/13/2022 before Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. The parties are directed to call the toll-free number 877-336-1274. The access code is 6534420. The parties shall dial in five (5) minutes before the conference. Counsel are directed to complete the attached Rule 26(f) Report and electronically file same with the Court no later than 9/09/2022. Should the parties wish to adopt a plan for discovery different from the structure in the Rule 26(f) Report, they may do so only if they file a letter explaining why such a plan is appropriate in this case. Upon receipt of this email counsel shall confirm with each other of the date and time of this telephonic initial conference. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 8/24/2022. (Manson, Eddie)
August 19, 2022 Filing 6 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference in anticipation of moving to dismiss the Complaint by Blackstone Labs, LLC, Philip Braun, Richard Newton. (Wenik, Jack)
August 12, 2022 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 12, 2022 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 12, 2022 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet by Blackstone Labs, LLC (Wenik, Jack)
August 12, 2022 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Blackstone Labs, LLC identifying Corporate Parent none for Blackstone Labs, LLC. (Wenik, Jack)
August 12, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Blackstone Labs, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANYEDC-15838220) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal) (Wenik, Jack)
August 12, 2022 Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. All questions *** INCLUDING the CERTIFICATION OF ARBITRATION ELIGIBILITY*** section on the second page needs to be answered. Please resubmit Civil Cover Sheet. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 12, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Diane Gujarati and Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 12, 2022 This case has been opened in the Eastern District of New York. If you plan to continue representing your client(s), you must be admitted to practice before this court. You must do so by applying for Pro Hac Vice or permanent admission. To apply for Pro Hac Vice admission, you must first register for an ECF login and password. Please visit the Court's website at www.nyed.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions for guidance. Once registered, you must electronically file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You must pay the required pro hac vice fee online. (Bowens, Priscilla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Koralewski v. Blackstone Labs, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maciej Koralewski
Represented By: Paul Thomas Sabaj
Represented By: Donald A. Pitofsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blackstone Labs, LLC
Represented By: Jack Wenik
Represented By: Jessica Leach
Represented By: Zachary Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philip Braun
Represented By: Jack Wenik
Represented By: Jessica Leach
Represented By: Zachary Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Newton
Represented By: Jack Wenik
Represented By: Jessica Leach
Represented By: Zachary Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?