Cristiano et al v. Exactech, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kathleen Cristiano and Anthony Cristiano
Defendant: Exactech, Inc. and Exactech US, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv05666
Filed: September 22, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Brian M Cogan
Referring Judge: Nicholas G Garaufis
2 Judge: Marcia M Henry
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 12, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2023 Filing 39 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Exactech US, Inc., Exactech, Inc., filed by Kathleen Cristiano, Anthony Cristiano. (Relkin, Ellen)
April 10, 2023 Filing 38 Letter re Joint Preservation Protocol by Exactech US, Inc., Exactech, Inc. Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03044-NGG-MMH et al. (Kanute, Michael) Modified on 4/11/2023 to modify event type (JD).
April 7, 2023 Filing 37 Letter re Science Day Order by Exactech US, Inc., Exactech, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03044-NGG-MMH et al. (Kanute, Michael)
April 7, 2023 Filing 36 Letter re Second Amended PFS Implementation Order by Exactech US, Inc., Exactech, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit) Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03044-NGG-MMH et al. (Kanute, Michael)
March 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 35 AMENDED FACT SHEET IMPLEMENTATION ORDER. The proposed amended fact sheet implementation order at ECF No. 137-1 and its four Exhibits are so ordered as amended. See attached. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Marcia M. Henry on 03/23/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03044-NGG-MMH et al. (JD) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/23/2023: #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (JD).
March 20, 2023 Filing 34 Letter re Science Day by Exactech US, Inc., Exactech, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order re Science Day, #2 Exhibit Defendants' Position re Paragraph 9, #3 Exhibit TPG's Request for Adjournment, #4 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Position re Adjournment and Paragraph 9) Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03044-NGG-MMH et al. (Kanute, Michael)
March 13, 2023 Filing 33 STATUS REPORT (Joint) by Exactech US, Inc., Exactech, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03044-NGG-MMH et al. (Kanute, Michael)
March 10, 2023 Filing 32 Letter Requesting Extension of Time to Respond to Master Complaint by Exactech US, Inc., Exactech, Inc. Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03044-NGG-MMH et al. (Kanute, Michael)
March 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney 130, 136: The law firm of Bowman and Brooke LLP, counsel for Defendants Exactech, Inc. and Exactech U.S., Inc., shall be terminated from the docket. The proposed order at ECF No. 130-1 is so ordered. See attached. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Marcia M. Henry on 03/07/2023. (JD)
March 6, 2023 Filing 30 STIPULATION re Broadspire Documents by Exactech US, Inc., Exactech, Inc. Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03044-NGG-MMH et al. (Kanute, Michael)
March 6, 2023 Filing 29 Letter re Fact Sheets by Exactech US, Inc., Exactech, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order re Fact Sheets, #2 Plaintiff Fact Sheet, #3 Plaintiff Supplemental Fact Sheet, #4 Defendant Fact Sheet, #5 Defendant Supplemental Fact Sheet) Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03044-NGG-MMH et al. (Kanute, Michael)
March 1, 2023 Filing 28 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Exactech, Inc., Exactech, US, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03044-NGG-MMH et al. (Bjork, Sheryl)
February 24, 2023 Filing 27 Letter Regarding Fact Sheets by Exactech Inc., Exactech US, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03044-NGG-MMH et al. (Kanute, Michael)
February 23, 2023 Filing 26 Letter regarding short form complaint by TPG, Inc., TPG Inc Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03044-NGG-MMH et al. (Rothman, Alan)
February 2, 2023 Filing 25 Letter Re: Short Form Complaint by In Re: Exactech Polyethylene Orthopedic Products Liability Litigation Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03044-NGG-MMH et al. (Relkin, Ellen)
January 26, 2023 Filing 24 Letter to Honorable Nicholas G. Garaufis, U.S.D.J. and Honorable Marcia Henry, U.S.M.J. re: Update on Plaintiff Website by In Re: Exactech Polyethylene Orthopedic Products Liability Litigation Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03044-NGG-MMH et al. (Kessler, Rayna)
January 11, 2023 Filing 23 NOTICE by Annette Alberti, Joseph Alberti, Lia M. Album, Joti Allen, Lawrence Batherwich, Elizabeth Beasley, Thomas Beasley, Andrew Bellian, Karen S Bellian, Allen Bellone, Lucille Bellone, Alexander Berger, Lawrence Berger, Rona Berger, Kenneth M. Bernstein, Geraldine Billups, Patrice Bindel, Jacob Brickman, Katherine Briscoe, Cynthia Brown, Norman Brown, James B. Burke, Barbara Byrd, Brian Camp, Cynthia Camp, Laquiesha Carolina, Daniel E. Carson, Joseph Centineo, Emanuel Cervelli, Bernadette Chance, Gary J. Cheramie, Charles Church, Elaine Church, Mary Cirrito, Michael Cirrito, Betty Carol Clark, Richard Cozadd, Anthony Cristiano, Kathleen Cristiano, Robert J. Cullum, Charles R. Cuneo, Joanne Cuneo, Lawrence Daly, Irene Danow, Keven Danow, Melissa Davis, Stephen Decorte, Susan Decorte, Annette Dellanno, Domenic Dellanno, Walton R. Diven, Ray H. Dovell, Jr, Paul Dunleavy, Wendy Dunleavy, Diane Fassler, Jeffrey Fassler, William Faulkner, Jimmy Flowers, Jr, Julia Flowers, James W. Forkum, Patricia Forkum, Lee Foxwell, Rex A. Foxwell, Constance R. Furey, William P. Furey, Nue Gega, Trashe Gega, Jack Gehm, Alison Gelfand, Lewis Gelfand, Leneatha Carole Glass, Steven Glass, Mark Goldman, Kelly Goodridge, Henri Gourd, Rachel Gray, John Greene, Amedeo Guglielmo, Theresa Guglielmo, Madelon M. Gutekunst, William O. Gutekunst, Herbert Hahn, Darist J Harrell, Wanda Harrell, Richard Haunss, Michael Head, Frank Hermann, Janice Hermann, Alan Hillie, Claudia Hillie, Robert Hodge, Jr, Tammy L. Hodge, Ivan Hoyos, Ronald Hoyt, Sandra Hoyt, Billy Hursey, Debbie Insdorf, Michael A Insdorf, Belkis Jacobs, PATRICIA KREITZMAN, Kevin Kenney, Laura Kenney, Robert A. Kindler, Sydney Welham Kindler, Deborah Kreitner, Richard Kreitner, Barbara Kreitzman, Harley G. Lappen, Geraldine Larson, Joseph M. Larson, Alice Laws, Willie Laws, Arcangelo Liberatore, Leslie Liberatore, Henry Lombardi, Henry Luddeke, Fara-Izarihs Maldonado, Jorge L. Maldonado, Alison Maresca, Domenick Maresca, Rebecca Matchett, Christopher Matchett, Deborah McBride, Donald McBride, Denise McGuire, Kevin McGuire, Ronald McNeese, Susan McNeese, Debra Meneese, Virginia Moraweck, Lori Morrison, Timothy Morrison, Ramona Navarre, Delores Northington, Joseph Northington, James Obrien, Willie Ann Oxendine, Judy Palmer, Kevin G. Patterson, Miroslabia Perez, Faina Pravin, Christopher Proscia, Rosemary Proscia, Mary Ellen Radics, Robert Radics, Richard Reilly, Donna M. Reyes, Paul Reyes, Robert Rhodes, Caroline Riley, Bruce Robertson, Linda Robertson, Anne Romano, Phillip Romano, Ronald Romero, Mary Christina Ross, Minerva Salazar, Christopher Santopietro, Linda Scherder, Neil Scherder, Jonathan Schrott, Susan Schrott, Corrine Sexton, Joseph Sexton, Kevin Simmons, Margaret Slanovec, Edward J. Smith, Ellis Smith, M. Christie Smith, Susan Stark, Barbara Taylor, Julian Taylor, James Teatom, Morris Tester, Sandra Tester, Gilda Thomas, Paul H. Uhle, James Vette, Edward Watson, Monica West, Walter West, Clayton Wilder, George Wilson, Valerie Wilson, David Zeevalk, Dawn Zeevalk, Bjorn von Euler, Sharon von Euler PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03044-NGG-MMH et al. (Relkin, Ellen)
January 11, 2023 Filing 22 NOTICE by Patrice Bindel, Daniel E. Carson, Paul H. Uhle, Gary J. Cheramie, Annette Dellanno, Domenic Dellanno, Paul Dunleavy, Wendy Dunleavy, Ray H. Dovell, Jr, Alice Laws, Willie Laws, Lia M. Album, Judy Palmer, Mary Christina Ross, Edward J. Smith, M. Christie Smith, Mary Cirrito, Michael Cirrito, Monica West, Walter West, Richard Cozadd, Deborah McBride, Donald McBride, Jimmy Afzali, Donna M. Reyes, Robert J. Cullum, Lawrence Berger, Carol Lappen, David Zeevalk, Dawn Zeevalk, Christina Chance, George Wilson, Valerie Wilson, Stephen Decorte, Susan Decorte, Emanuel Cervelli, Robert Rhodes, Ivan Hoyos, Charles M Agro, Annette Alberti, Joseph Alberti, Joti Allen, Lawrence Batherwich, Elizabeth Beasley, Thomas Beasley, Andrew Bellian, Karen S Bellian, Allen Bellone, Lucille Bellone, Alexander Berger, Rona Berger, Kenneth M. Bernstein, Geraldine Billups, Jacob Brickman, Katherine Briscoe, Cynthia Brown, Norman Brown, James B. Burke, Barbara Byrd, Brian Camp, Cynthia Camp, Laquiesha Carolina, Joseph Centineo, Bernadette Chance, Charles Church, Elaine Church, Betty Carol Clark, Anthony Cristiano, Kathleen Cristiano, Charles R. Cuneo, Joanne Cuneo, Lawrence Daly, Irene Danow, Keven Danow, Melissa Davis, Walton R. Diven, Diane Fassler, Jeffrey Fassler, William Faulkner, Jimmy Flowers, Jr, Julia Flowers, James W. Forkum, Patricia Forkum, Lee Foxwell, Rex A. Foxwell, Constance R. Furey, William P. Furey, Nue Gega, Trashe Gega, Jack Gehm, Alison Gelfand, Lewis Gelfand, Leneatha Carole Glass, Steven Glass, Mark Goldman, Kelly Goodridge, Henri Gourd, Rachel Gray, John Greene, Amedeo Guglielmo, Theresa Guglielmo, Madelon M. Gutekunst, William O. Gutekunst, Herbert Hahn, Darist J Harrell, Wanda Harrell, Richard Haunss, Michael Head, Claudia Hillie, Robert Hodge, Jr, Tammy L. Hodge, Ronald Hoyt, Sandra Hoyt, Billy Hursey, Debbie Insdorf, Michael A Insdorf, Belkis Jacobs, PATRICIA KREITZMAN, Kevin Kenney, Laura Kenney, Robert A. Kindler, Sydney Welham Kindler, Deborah Kreitner, Richard Kreitner, Barbara Kreitzman, Harley G. Lappen, Geraldine Larson, Joseph M. Larson, Arcangelo Liberatore, Leslie Liberatore, Henry Lombardi, Henry Luddeke, MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, Fara-Izarihs Maldonado, Jorge L. Maldonado, Alison Maresca, Domenick Maresca, Rebecca Matchett, Christopher Matchett, Denise McGuire, Kevin McGuire, Ronald McNeese, Susan McNeese, Debra Meneese, Virginia Moraweck, Lori Morrison, Timothy Morrison, Ramona Navarre, Delores Northington, Joseph Northington, James Obrien, Willie Ann Oxendine, Kevin G. Patterson, Miroslabia Perez, Faina Pravin, Christopher Proscia, Rosemary Proscia, Mary Ellen Radics, Robert Radics, Richard Reilly, Paul Reyes, Caroline Riley, Bruce Robertson, Linda Robertson, Anne Romano, Phillip Romano, Ronald Romero, Minerva Salazar, Christopher Santopietro, Linda Scherder, Neil Scherder, Jonathan Schrott, Susan Schrott, Corrine Sexton, Joseph Sexton, Kevin Simmons, Margaret Slanovec, Ellis Smith, M. Christie Smith, Susan Stark Proposed Practice and Procedure Order #3 (Electronic Service) Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03044-NGG-MMH et al. (Relkin, Ellen)
January 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 AMENDED PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE ORDER NO. 2 (Direct Filing). So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 1/11/2023. Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03044-NGG-MMH et al. (TL)
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE ORDER NO. 2 (Direct Filing). So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 1/3/2023. Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03044-NGG-MMH et al. (TL)
December 30, 2022 Filing 19 Letter and Proposed Direct Filing Order by Patrice Bindel, Daniel E. Carson, Paul H. Uhle, Nue Gega, Trashe Gega, Gary J. Cheramie, Paul Dunleavy, Wendy Dunleavy, Annette Dellanno, Domenic Dellanno, Ray H. Dovell, Jr, Robert Hodge, Jr, Tammy L. Hodge, Miroslabia Perez, Betty Carol Clark, Alice Laws, Willie Laws, Charles Church, Elaine Church, Richard Haunss, Joti Allen, Alison Maresca, Domenick Maresca, Diane Fassler, Jeffrey Fassler, Lia M. Album, Judy Palmer, Mary Christina Ross, Constance R. Furey, William P. Furey, Bjorn von Euler, Sharon von Euler, Anthony Cristiano, Kathleen Cristiano, Edward J. Smith, M. Christie Smith, Virginia Moraweck, Monica West, Walter West, Mary Cirrito, Michael Cirrito, Richard Cozadd, Deborah McBride, Donald McBride, Jimmy Afzali, Donna M. Reyes, Richard Reilly, Robert J. Cullum, Elizabeth Beasley, Thomas Beasley, Lawrence Berger, Kevin G. Patterson, Carol Lappen, David Zeevalk, Dawn Zeevalk, Rosemary Proscia, Christopher Proscia, Christina Chance, Alexander Berger, Rona Berger, Clayton Wilder, George Wilson, Valerie Wilson, Alison Gelfand, Lewis Gelfand, Stephen Decorte, Susan Decorte, Emanuel Cervelli, Robert Rhodes, Kevin Kenney, Laura Kenney, Caroline Riley, Margaret Slanovec, Joseph Centineo, Ivan Hoyos, Corrine Sexton, Joseph Sexton, James Obrien, Geraldine Billups, Charles M Agro, Annette Alberti, Joseph Alberti, Lawrence Batherwich, Andrew Bellian, Karen S Bellian, Allen Bellone, Lucille Bellone, Kenneth M. Bernstein, Jacob Brickman, Katherine Briscoe, Cynthia Brown, Norman Brown, James B. Burke, Brian Camp, Cynthia Camp, Laquiesha Carolina, Bernadette Chance, Charles R. Cuneo, Joanne Cuneo, Lawrence Daly, Irene Danow, Keven Danow, Melissa Davis, Walton R. Diven, William Faulkner, Jimmy Flowers, Jr, Julia Flowers, Lee Foxwell, Rex A. Foxwell, Jack Gehm, Leneatha Carole Glass, Steven Glass, Mark Goldman, Henri Gourd, Rachel Gray, John Greene, Amedeo Guglielmo, Theresa Guglielmo, Madelon M. Gutekunst, William O. Gutekunst, Herbert Hahn, Michael Head, Frank Hermann, Janice Hermann, Alan Hillie, Claudia Hillie, Ronald Hoyt, Sandra Hoyt, Debbie Insdorf, Michael A Insdorf, Belkis Jacobs, PATRICIA KREITZMAN, Robert A. Kindler, Sydney Welham Kindler, Deborah Kreitner, Richard Kreitner, Barbara Kreitzman, Harley G. Lappen Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03044-NGG-MMH et al. (Relkin, Ellen)
December 21, 2022 Filing 18 Letter To Honorable Nicholas G. Garaufis and Honorable Marcia M. Henry by Exactech, Inc., Exactech, US, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03044-NGG-MMH et al. (Kanute, Michael)
December 9, 2022 Filing 17 Letter in response to the Courts December 6, 2022 Order by Patrice Bindel, Daniel E. Carson, Paul H. Uhle, Nue Gega, Trashe Gega, Gary J. Cheramie, Annette Dellanno, Domenic Dellanno, Paul Dunleavy, Wendy Dunleavy, Ray H. Dovell, Jr, Robert Hodge, Jr, Tammy L. Hodge, Miroslabia Perez, Betty Carol Clark, Alice Laws, Willie Laws, Richard Haunss, Charles Church, Elaine Church, Joti Allen, Alison Maresca, Domenick Maresca, Diane Fassler, Jeffrey Fassler, Judy Palmer, Constance R. Furey, William P. Furey, Mary Christina Ross, Bjorn von Euler, Sharon von Euler, Anthony Cristiano, Kathleen Cristiano, Mary Cirrito, Michael Cirrito, Monica West, Walter West, Deborah McBride, Donald McBride, Jimmy Afzali, Donna M. Reyes, Richard Reilly, Elizabeth Beasley, Thomas Beasley, Lawrence Berger, Kevin G. Patterson, Carol Lappen, David Zeevalk, Dawn Zeevalk, Rosemary Proscia, Christopher Proscia, Christina Chance, Alexander Berger, Rona Berger, Clayton Wilder, George Wilson, Valerie Wilson, Alison Gelfand, Lewis Gelfand, Stephen Decorte, Susan Decorte, Emanuel Cervelli, Robert Rhodes, Kevin Kenney, Laura Kenney, Caroline Riley, Margaret Slanovec, Ivan Hoyos, Joseph Centineo, Corrine Sexton, Joseph Sexton, James Obrien, Geraldine Billups, Charles M Agro, Annette Alberti, Joseph Alberti, Lawrence Batherwich, Andrew Bellian, Karen S Bellian, Allen Bellone, Lucille Bellone, Kenneth M. Bernstein, Jacob Brickman, Katherine Briscoe, Cynthia Brown, Norman Brown, James B. Burke, Brian Camp, Cynthia Camp, Laquiesha Carolina, Bernadette Chance, Charles R. Cuneo, Joanne Cuneo, Lawrence Daly, Irene Danow, Keven Danow, Melissa Davis, Walton R. Diven, Jimmy Flowers, Jr, Julia Flowers, Lee Foxwell, Rex A. Foxwell, Jack Gehm, Leneatha Carole Glass, Steven Glass, Mark Goldman, Henri Gourd, John Greene, Amedeo Guglielmo, Theresa Guglielmo, Madelon M. Gutekunst, William O. Gutekunst, Herbert Hahn, Michael Head, Ronald Hoyt, Sandra Hoyt, Debbie Insdorf, Michael A Insdorf, Belkis Jacobs, PATRICIA KREITZMAN, Robert A. Kindler, Sydney Welham Kindler, Barbara Kreitzman, Harley G. Lappen, Geraldine Larson, Joseph M. Larson, Arcangelo Liberatore, Leslie Liberatore, Henry Lombardi, Fara-Izarihs Maldonado, Jorge L. Maldonado, Rebecca Matchett, Christopher Matchett, Denise McGuire, Kevin McGuire, Ronald McNeese, Susan McNeese, Debra Meneese, Lori Morrison, Timothy Morrison, Delores Northington, Joseph Northington, Willie Ann Oxendine, Faina Pravin, Mary Ellen Radics, Robert Radics, Paul Reyes, Bruce Robertson, Linda Robertson, Anne Romano, Phillip Romano, Ronald Romero, Minerva Salazar, Christopher Santopietro, Linda Scherder, Neil Scherder, Ellis Smith, Susan Stark, Barbara Taylor, Julian Taylor, James Teatom, Morris Tester, Sandra Tester, Gilda Thomas, James Vette, Edward Watson, George Wilson, Allan Bellone, Kevin McGuire Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03044-NGG-MMH et al. (Relkin, Ellen)
November 29, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Patrice Bindel, Daniel E. Carson, Paul H. Uhle, Nue Gega, Trashe Gega, Gary J. Cheramie, Paul Dunleavy, Wendy Dunleavy, Annette Dellanno, Domenic Dellanno, Ray H. Dovell, Jr, Robert Hodge, Jr, Tammy L. Hodge, Miroslabia Perez, Betty Carol Clark, Alice Laws, Willie Laws, Richard Haunss, Joti Allen, Alison Maresca, Domenick Maresca, Diane Fassler, Jeffrey Fassler, Judy Palmer, Constance R. Furey, William P. Furey, Bjorn von Euler, Sharon von Euler, Anthony Cristiano, Kathleen Cristiano, Mary Cirrito, Michael Cirrito, Deborah McBride, Donald McBride, Jimmy Afzali, Donna M. Reyes, Richard Reilly, Lawrence Berger, Kevin G. Patterson, Carol Lappen, David Zeevalk, Dawn Zeevalk, Rosemary Proscia, Christopher Proscia, Alexander Berger, Rona Berger, Clayton Wilder, George Wilson, Valerie Wilson, Alison Gelfand, Lewis Gelfand, Stephen Decorte, Susan Decorte, Emanuel Cervelli, Robert Rhodes, Kevin Kenney, Laura Kenney, Caroline Riley, Margaret Slanovec, Joseph Centineo, Ivan Hoyos, James Obrien, Geraldine Billups, Charles M Agro, Annette Alberti, Joseph Alberti, Lawrence Batherwich, Andrew Bellian, Karen S Bellian, Allen Bellone, Lucille Bellone, Kenneth M. Bernstein, Jacob Brickman, Katherine Briscoe, Cynthia Brown, Norman Brown, James B. Burke, Brian Camp, Cynthia Camp, Laquiesha Carolina, Charles R. Cuneo, Joanne Cuneo, Lawrence Daly, Irene Danow, Keven Danow, Melissa Davis, Walton R. Diven, Jimmy Flowers, Jr, Julia Flowers, Lee Foxwell, Rex A. Foxwell, Jack Gehm, Mark Goldman, Henri Gourd, John Greene, Amedeo Guglielmo, Theresa Guglielmo, Madelon M. Gutekunst, William O. Gutekunst, Herbert Hahn, Michael Head, Ronald Hoyt, Sandra Hoyt, Debbie Insdorf, Michael A Insdorf, Belkis Jacobs, PATRICIA KREITZMAN, Robert A. Kindler, Sydney Welham Kindler, Barbara Kreitzman, Harley G. Lappen, Geraldine Larson, Joseph M. Larson, Arcangelo Liberatore, Leslie Liberatore, Henry Lombardi, Fara-Izarihs Maldonado, Jorge L. Maldonado, Rebecca Matchett, Christopher Matchett, Denise McGuire, Kevin McGuire, Ronald McNeese, Susan McNeese, Debra Meneese, Lori Morrison, Timothy Morrison, Delores Northington, Joseph Northington, Willie Ann Oxendine, Faina Pravin, Mary Ellen Radics, Robert Radics. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - CV - Kirk Pope, #2 Exhibit 2 - CV - Ellen Relkin, #3 Exhibit 3 - CV - Robert E. (Eric) Kennedy, #4 Exhibit 4 - CV - Carasusana B. Wall, #5 Exhibit 5 - CV - C. Calvin Warriner, #6 Exhibit 6 - CV - Rayna E. Kessler, #7 Exhibit 7 - CV - Joseph H. Saunders, #8 Exhibit 8 - CV - Mark P. Chalos, #9 Exhibit 9 - CV - Michael P. Cutler, #10 Exhibit 10 - CV - Maria Fleming, #11 Exhibit 11 - CV - Arati Furness, #12 Exhibit 12 - CV - Jason S. Goldstein, #13 Exhibit 13 - CV - David Harman, #14 Exhibit 14 - CV - Kristine K. Kraft, #15 Exhibit 15 - CV - Hadley E. Lundback, #16 Exhibit 16 - CV - Ben C. Martin, #17 Exhibit 17 - CV - Daniel A. Nigh, #18 Exhibit 18 - CV - Justin Presnal, #19 Exhibit 19 - CV - Patrick J. Wigle, #20 Exhibit 20 - CV - Cameron J. Falcon, #21 Exhibit 21 - CV - Kevin M. Fitzgerald, #22 Exhibit 22 - CV - Danielle Gold, #23 Exhibit 23 - CV - George E. Mclaughlin, #24 Exhibit 24 - CV - Courtney L. Mohammadi, #25 Exhibit 25 - CV - Joanna H. Oh, #26 Exhibit 26 - CV - Craig M. Silverman, #27 Exhibit 27 - CV - Ilana S. Wolk) Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03044-NGG-MMH et al. (Relkin, Ellen)
November 23, 2022 Filing 15 Letter by Exactech, Inc., Exactech, US, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03044-NGG-MMH et al. (Kanute, Michael)
November 15, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Kim M Schmid on behalf of Exactech, Inc., Exactech, US, Inc., Exactech Inc., Exactech US, Inc., Exactech, Inc., Exactech, US, Exactech Inc., Exactech US, Inc., Exactech US, Exactech, U.S., Inc., Exactech U.S., Inc., Exactech, US, Inc. (aty to be noticed) Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03044-NGG-MMH et al. (Schmid, Kim)
November 14, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Sheryl A. Bjork on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03044-NGG-MMH et al. (Bjork, Sheryl)
November 8, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean J. Powell on behalf of Exactech, Inc., Exactech, US, Inc. (notification declined or already on case) Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03044-NGG-MMH et al. (Powell, Sean)
November 8, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Kanute on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03044-NGG-MMH et al. (Kanute, Michael)
November 7, 2022 Filing 10 STATUS REPORT by Diane Fassler, Jeffrey Fassler, Michael Head, Arcangelo Liberatore, Leslie Liberatore, Michael A Insdorf, Ivan Hoyos, Anthony Cristiano, Kathleen Cristiano, Nue Gega, Trashe Gega, Lawrence Daly, Alexander Berger, Lawrence Berger, Rona Berger, Patrice Bindel, Brian Camp, Cynthia Camp, Emanuel Cervelli, Mark Goldman, Herbert Hahn, Debbie Insdorf Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03044-NGG-MMH et al. (Relkin, Ellen)
November 7, 2022 Filing 9 STATUS REPORT by Exactech, Inc., Exactech, US, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03044-NGG-MMH et al. (Bjork, Sheryl)
October 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE ORDER NO. 1. So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 10/25/2022. Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03044-NGG-MMH et al. (TL)
October 18, 2022 Case Reassigned to Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis and Magistrate Judge Marcia M. Henry. Judge Brian M. Cogan no longer assigned to the case. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (TL)
October 18, 2022 Cases associated 1:22-md-3044. (TL)
October 3, 2022 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kathleen Cristiano, Anthony Cristiano. Exactech US, Inc. waiver sent on 10/3/2022, answer due 12/2/2022. (Relkin, Ellen)
October 3, 2022 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kathleen Cristiano, Anthony Cristiano. Exactech, Inc. waiver sent on 10/3/2022, answer due 12/2/2022. (Relkin, Ellen)
September 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER: A telephonic Initial Status Conference is set for 11/3/2022 at 11:00 am. Parties will use the toll-free number 888-684-8852 followed by access code 6427877#. When the conference begins parties will be prompted to input the security code 5666#. See attached mandatory requirements for the conference. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 9/22/2022. (Weisberg, Peggy)
September 22, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Exactech US, Inc., Exactech, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Davis, Kimberly)
September 22, 2022 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
September 22, 2022 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
September 22, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Exactech US, Inc., Exactech, Inc. filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-15966333 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Kathleen Cristiano, Anthony Cristiano. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Exactech, Inc., #3 Proposed Summons Exactech US, Inc.) (Relkin, Ellen)
September 22, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Brian M. Cogan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cristiano et al v. Exactech, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Cristiano
Represented By: Ellen Relkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Cristiano
Represented By: Ellen Relkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exactech, Inc.
Represented By: James S. Bennett
Represented By: Kim M Schmid
Represented By: Sean J. Powell
Represented By: Michael J. Kanute
Represented By: Sheryl A. Bjork
Represented By: Susan M. Sharko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exactech US, Inc.
Represented By: Kim M Schmid
Represented By: Sean J. Powell
Represented By: Michael J. Kanute
Represented By: James S. Bennett
Represented By: Sheryl A. Bjork
Represented By: Susan M. Sharko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?