Curtis v. DNATA Aviation USA, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jacori Curtis
Defendant: DNATA Aviation USA, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv05932
Filed: October 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Rachel P Kovner
Referring Judge: Robert M Levy
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2022 Filing 8 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, Extending Time for Defendants to Answer by DNATA Aviation USA, Inc. (Porta, John)
November 8, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Shannon Danielle Azzaro on behalf of DNATA Aviation USA, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Azzaro, Shannon)
November 8, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by John J. Porta on behalf of DNATA Aviation USA, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Porta, John)
November 8, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER re #8 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, Extending Time for Defendants to Answer by DNATA Aviation USA, Inc. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 11/8/2022. (JM)
November 1, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jacori Curtis. DNATA Aviation USA, Inc. served on 10/21/2022, answer due 11/11/2022. (Gangat, Mohammed)
October 4, 2022 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (PB)
October 4, 2022 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (PB)
October 4, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to DNATA Aviation USA, Inc.. (PB)
October 4, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DNATA Aviation USA, Inc. filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-16004147 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Jacori Curtis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Gangat, Mohammed)
October 4, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Rachel P. Kovner and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (PB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Curtis v. DNATA Aviation USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacori Curtis
Represented By: Mohammed Gangat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DNATA Aviation USA, Inc.
Represented By: John J. Porta
Represented By: Shannon Danielle Azzaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?