Murphy v. Genesis Detox of Brooklyn LLC MSW IP et al
Plaintiff: David Murphy
Defendant: Genesis Detox of Brooklyn LLC MSW IP and Monte Unknown
Case Number: 1:2022cv06568
Filed: October 27, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Diane Gujarati
Referring Judge: Peggy Kuo
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2022 Filing 6 Letter from David Murphy to Judge Gujarati dated 12/11/2022 re: case. (IH)
November 7, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by David Murphy. (IH)
November 7, 2022 Filing 4 Prisoner Authorization (IH)
November 3, 2022 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (KD)
November 3, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT FILING, litigant notified of deficiency(s) that must be corrected within fourteen (14) days. Mailed out on 11/3/2022 (KD)
October 27, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by David Murphy. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (SR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murphy v. Genesis Detox of Brooklyn LLC MSW IP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesis Detox of Brooklyn LLC MSW IP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monte Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?