Tester et al v. Exactech Inc et al
Plaintiff: Sandra Tester and Morris Tester
Defendant: Exactech Inc. and Exactech U.S., Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv07222
Filed: November 29, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Office: Brooklyn Office
Presiding Judge: Nicholas G Garaufis
Referring Judge: Marcia M Henry
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2023 Filing 18 Letter to Honorable Nicholas G. Garaufis, U.S.D.J. and Honorable Marcia Henry, U.S.M.J. re: Update on Plaintiff Website by In Re: Exactech Polyethylene Orthopedic Products Liability Litigation Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03044-NGG-MMH et al. (Kessler, Rayna)
January 11, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE by Annette Alberti, Joseph Alberti, Lia M. Album, Joti Allen, Lawrence Batherwich, Elizabeth Beasley, Thomas Beasley, Andrew Bellian, Karen S Bellian, Allen Bellone, Lucille Bellone, Alexander Berger, Lawrence Berger, Rona Berger, Kenneth M. Bernstein, Geraldine Billups, Patrice Bindel, Jacob Brickman, Katherine Briscoe, Cynthia Brown, Norman Brown, James B. Burke, Barbara Byrd, Brian Camp, Cynthia Camp, Laquiesha Carolina, Daniel E. Carson, Joseph Centineo, Emanuel Cervelli, Bernadette Chance, Gary J. Cheramie, Charles Church, Elaine Church, Mary Cirrito, Michael Cirrito, Betty Carol Clark, Richard Cozadd, Anthony Cristiano, Kathleen Cristiano, Robert J. Cullum, Charles R. Cuneo, Joanne Cuneo, Lawrence Daly, Irene Danow, Keven Danow, Melissa Davis, Stephen Decorte, Susan Decorte, Annette Dellanno, Domenic Dellanno, Walton R. Diven, Ray H. Dovell, Jr, Paul Dunleavy, Wendy Dunleavy, Diane Fassler, Jeffrey Fassler, William Faulkner, Jimmy Flowers, Jr, Julia Flowers, James W. Forkum, Patricia Forkum, Lee Foxwell, Rex A. Foxwell, Constance R. Furey, William P. Furey, Nue Gega, Trashe Gega, Jack Gehm, Alison Gelfand, Lewis Gelfand, Leneatha Carole Glass, Steven Glass, Mark Goldman, Kelly Goodridge, Henri Gourd, Rachel Gray, John Greene, Amedeo Guglielmo, Theresa Guglielmo, Madelon M. Gutekunst, William O. Gutekunst, Herbert Hahn, Darist J Harrell, Wanda Harrell, Richard Haunss, Michael Head, Frank Hermann, Janice Hermann, Alan Hillie, Claudia Hillie, Robert Hodge, Jr, Tammy L. Hodge, Ivan Hoyos, Ronald Hoyt, Sandra Hoyt, Billy Hursey, Debbie Insdorf, Michael A Insdorf, Belkis Jacobs, PATRICIA KREITZMAN, Kevin Kenney, Laura Kenney, Robert A. Kindler, Sydney Welham Kindler, Deborah Kreitner, Richard Kreitner, Barbara Kreitzman, Harley G. Lappen, Geraldine Larson, Joseph M. Larson, Alice Laws, Willie Laws, Arcangelo Liberatore, Leslie Liberatore, Henry Lombardi, Henry Luddeke, Fara-Izarihs Maldonado, Jorge L. Maldonado, Alison Maresca, Domenick Maresca, Rebecca Matchett, Christopher Matchett, Deborah McBride, Donald McBride, Denise McGuire, Kevin McGuire, Ronald McNeese, Susan McNeese, Debra Meneese, Virginia Moraweck, Lori Morrison, Timothy Morrison, Ramona Navarre, Delores Northington, Joseph Northington, James Obrien, Willie Ann Oxendine, Judy Palmer, Kevin G. Patterson, Miroslabia Perez, Faina Pravin, Christopher Proscia, Rosemary Proscia, Mary Ellen Radics, Robert Radics, Richard Reilly, Donna M. Reyes, Paul Reyes, Robert Rhodes, Caroline Riley, Bruce Robertson, Linda Robertson, Anne Romano, Phillip Romano, Ronald Romero, Mary Christina Ross, Minerva Salazar, Christopher Santopietro, Linda Scherder, Neil Scherder, Jonathan Schrott, Susan Schrott, Corrine Sexton, Joseph Sexton, Kevin Simmons, Margaret Slanovec, Edward J. Smith, Ellis Smith, M. Christie Smith, Susan Stark, Barbara Taylor, Julian Taylor, James Teatom, Morris Tester, Sandra Tester, Gilda Thomas, Paul H. Uhle, James Vette, Edward Watson, Monica West, Walter West, Clayton Wilder, George Wilson, Valerie Wilson, David Zeevalk, Dawn Zeevalk, Bjorn von Euler, Sharon von Euler PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03044-NGG-MMH et al. (Relkin, Ellen)
January 11, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE by Patrice Bindel, Daniel E. Carson, Paul H. Uhle, Gary J. Cheramie, Annette Dellanno, Domenic Dellanno, Paul Dunleavy, Wendy Dunleavy, Ray H. Dovell, Jr, Alice Laws, Willie Laws, Lia M. Album, Judy Palmer, Mary Christina Ross, Edward J. Smith, M. Christie Smith, Mary Cirrito, Michael Cirrito, Monica West, Walter West, Richard Cozadd, Deborah McBride, Donald McBride, Jimmy Afzali, Donna M. Reyes, Robert J. Cullum, Lawrence Berger, Carol Lappen, David Zeevalk, Dawn Zeevalk, Christina Chance, George Wilson, Valerie Wilson, Stephen Decorte, Susan Decorte, Emanuel Cervelli, Robert Rhodes, Ivan Hoyos, Charles M Agro, Annette Alberti, Joseph Alberti, Joti Allen, Lawrence Batherwich, Elizabeth Beasley, Thomas Beasley, Andrew Bellian, Karen S Bellian, Allen Bellone, Lucille Bellone, Alexander Berger, Rona Berger, Kenneth M. Bernstein, Geraldine Billups, Jacob Brickman, Katherine Briscoe, Cynthia Brown, Norman Brown, James B. Burke, Barbara Byrd, Brian Camp, Cynthia Camp, Laquiesha Carolina, Joseph Centineo, Bernadette Chance, Charles Church, Elaine Church, Betty Carol Clark, Anthony Cristiano, Kathleen Cristiano, Charles R. Cuneo, Joanne Cuneo, Lawrence Daly, Irene Danow, Keven Danow, Melissa Davis, Walton R. Diven, Diane Fassler, Jeffrey Fassler, William Faulkner, Jimmy Flowers, Jr, Julia Flowers, James W. Forkum, Patricia Forkum, Lee Foxwell, Rex A. Foxwell, Constance R. Furey, William P. Furey, Nue Gega, Trashe Gega, Jack Gehm, Alison Gelfand, Lewis Gelfand, Leneatha Carole Glass, Steven Glass, Mark Goldman, Kelly Goodridge, Henri Gourd, Rachel Gray, John Greene, Amedeo Guglielmo, Theresa Guglielmo, Madelon M. Gutekunst, William O. Gutekunst, Herbert Hahn, Darist J Harrell, Wanda Harrell, Richard Haunss, Michael Head, Claudia Hillie, Robert Hodge, Jr, Tammy L. Hodge, Ronald Hoyt, Sandra Hoyt, Billy Hursey, Debbie Insdorf, Michael A Insdorf, Belkis Jacobs, PATRICIA KREITZMAN, Kevin Kenney, Laura Kenney, Robert A. Kindler, Sydney Welham Kindler, Deborah Kreitner, Richard Kreitner, Barbara Kreitzman, Harley G. Lappen, Geraldine Larson, Joseph M. Larson, Arcangelo Liberatore, Leslie Liberatore, Henry Lombardi, Henry Luddeke, MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, Fara-Izarihs Maldonado, Jorge L. Maldonado, Alison Maresca, Domenick Maresca, Rebecca Matchett, Christopher Matchett, Denise McGuire, Kevin McGuire, Ronald McNeese, Susan McNeese, Debra Meneese, Virginia Moraweck, Lori Morrison, Timothy Morrison, Ramona Navarre, Delores Northington, Joseph Northington, James Obrien, Willie Ann Oxendine, Kevin G. Patterson, Miroslabia Perez, Faina Pravin, Christopher Proscia, Rosemary Proscia, Mary Ellen Radics, Robert Radics, Richard Reilly, Paul Reyes, Caroline Riley, Bruce Robertson, Linda Robertson, Anne Romano, Phillip Romano, Ronald Romero, Minerva Salazar, Christopher Santopietro, Linda Scherder, Neil Scherder, Jonathan Schrott, Susan Schrott, Corrine Sexton, Joseph Sexton, Kevin Simmons, Margaret Slanovec, Ellis Smith, M. Christie Smith, Susan Stark Proposed Practice and Procedure Order #3 (Electronic Service) Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03044-NGG-MMH et al. (Relkin, Ellen)
January 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 AMENDED PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE ORDER NO. 2 (Direct Filings). Direct filings are to be made as new civil actions in this District and are not to be filed directly into 22md3044. So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 1/11/2023. Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03044-NGG-MMH et al. (TL) Modified descriptive text on 1/27/2023 (TL).
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE ORDER NO. 2 (Direct Filing). So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 1/3/2023. Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03044-NGG-MMH et al. (TL)
December 30, 2022 Filing 13 Letter and Proposed Direct Filing Order by Patrice Bindel, Daniel E. Carson, Paul H. Uhle, Nue Gega, Trashe Gega, Gary J. Cheramie, Paul Dunleavy, Wendy Dunleavy, Annette Dellanno, Domenic Dellanno, Ray H. Dovell, Jr, Robert Hodge, Jr, Tammy L. Hodge, Miroslabia Perez, Betty Carol Clark, Alice Laws, Willie Laws, Charles Church, Elaine Church, Richard Haunss, Joti Allen, Alison Maresca, Domenick Maresca, Diane Fassler, Jeffrey Fassler, Lia M. Album, Judy Palmer, Mary Christina Ross, Constance R. Furey, William P. Furey, Bjorn von Euler, Sharon von Euler, Anthony Cristiano, Kathleen Cristiano, Edward J. Smith, M. Christie Smith, Virginia Moraweck, Monica West, Walter West, Mary Cirrito, Michael Cirrito, Richard Cozadd, Deborah McBride, Donald McBride, Jimmy Afzali, Donna M. Reyes, Richard Reilly, Robert J. Cullum, Elizabeth Beasley, Thomas Beasley, Lawrence Berger, Kevin G. Patterson, Carol Lappen, David Zeevalk, Dawn Zeevalk, Rosemary Proscia, Christopher Proscia, Christina Chance, Alexander Berger, Rona Berger, Clayton Wilder, George Wilson, Valerie Wilson, Alison Gelfand, Lewis Gelfand, Stephen Decorte, Susan Decorte, Emanuel Cervelli, Robert Rhodes, Kevin Kenney, Laura Kenney, Caroline Riley, Margaret Slanovec, Joseph Centineo, Ivan Hoyos, Corrine Sexton, Joseph Sexton, James Obrien, Geraldine Billups, Charles M Agro, Annette Alberti, Joseph Alberti, Lawrence Batherwich, Andrew Bellian, Karen S Bellian, Allen Bellone, Lucille Bellone, Kenneth M. Bernstein, Jacob Brickman, Katherine Briscoe, Cynthia Brown, Norman Brown, James B. Burke, Brian Camp, Cynthia Camp, Laquiesha Carolina, Bernadette Chance, Charles R. Cuneo, Joanne Cuneo, Lawrence Daly, Irene Danow, Keven Danow, Melissa Davis, Walton R. Diven, William Faulkner, Jimmy Flowers, Jr, Julia Flowers, Lee Foxwell, Rex A. Foxwell, Jack Gehm, Leneatha Carole Glass, Steven Glass, Mark Goldman, Henri Gourd, Rachel Gray, John Greene, Amedeo Guglielmo, Theresa Guglielmo, Madelon M. Gutekunst, William O. Gutekunst, Herbert Hahn, Michael Head, Frank Hermann, Janice Hermann, Alan Hillie, Claudia Hillie, Ronald Hoyt, Sandra Hoyt, Debbie Insdorf, Michael A Insdorf, Belkis Jacobs, PATRICIA KREITZMAN, Robert A. Kindler, Sydney Welham Kindler, Deborah Kreitner, Richard Kreitner, Barbara Kreitzman, Harley G. Lappen Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03044-NGG-MMH et al. (Relkin, Ellen)
December 21, 2022 Filing 12 Letter To Honorable Nicholas G. Garaufis and Honorable Marcia M. Henry by Exactech, Inc., Exactech, US, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03044-NGG-MMH et al. (Kanute, Michael)
December 9, 2022 Filing 11 Letter in response to the Courts December 6, 2022 Order by Patrice Bindel, Daniel E. Carson, Paul H. Uhle, Nue Gega, Trashe Gega, Gary J. Cheramie, Annette Dellanno, Domenic Dellanno, Paul Dunleavy, Wendy Dunleavy, Ray H. Dovell, Jr, Robert Hodge, Jr, Tammy L. Hodge, Miroslabia Perez, Betty Carol Clark, Alice Laws, Willie Laws, Richard Haunss, Charles Church, Elaine Church, Joti Allen, Alison Maresca, Domenick Maresca, Diane Fassler, Jeffrey Fassler, Judy Palmer, Constance R. Furey, William P. Furey, Mary Christina Ross, Bjorn von Euler, Sharon von Euler, Anthony Cristiano, Kathleen Cristiano, Mary Cirrito, Michael Cirrito, Monica West, Walter West, Deborah McBride, Donald McBride, Jimmy Afzali, Donna M. Reyes, Richard Reilly, Elizabeth Beasley, Thomas Beasley, Lawrence Berger, Kevin G. Patterson, Carol Lappen, David Zeevalk, Dawn Zeevalk, Rosemary Proscia, Christopher Proscia, Christina Chance, Alexander Berger, Rona Berger, Clayton Wilder, George Wilson, Valerie Wilson, Alison Gelfand, Lewis Gelfand, Stephen Decorte, Susan Decorte, Emanuel Cervelli, Robert Rhodes, Kevin Kenney, Laura Kenney, Caroline Riley, Margaret Slanovec, Ivan Hoyos, Joseph Centineo, Corrine Sexton, Joseph Sexton, James Obrien, Geraldine Billups, Charles M Agro, Annette Alberti, Joseph Alberti, Lawrence Batherwich, Andrew Bellian, Karen S Bellian, Allen Bellone, Lucille Bellone, Kenneth M. Bernstein, Jacob Brickman, Katherine Briscoe, Cynthia Brown, Norman Brown, James B. Burke, Brian Camp, Cynthia Camp, Laquiesha Carolina, Bernadette Chance, Charles R. Cuneo, Joanne Cuneo, Lawrence Daly, Irene Danow, Keven Danow, Melissa Davis, Walton R. Diven, Jimmy Flowers, Jr, Julia Flowers, Lee Foxwell, Rex A. Foxwell, Jack Gehm, Leneatha Carole Glass, Steven Glass, Mark Goldman, Henri Gourd, John Greene, Amedeo Guglielmo, Theresa Guglielmo, Madelon M. Gutekunst, William O. Gutekunst, Herbert Hahn, Michael Head, Ronald Hoyt, Sandra Hoyt, Debbie Insdorf, Michael A Insdorf, Belkis Jacobs, PATRICIA KREITZMAN, Robert A. Kindler, Sydney Welham Kindler, Barbara Kreitzman, Harley G. Lappen, Geraldine Larson, Joseph M. Larson, Arcangelo Liberatore, Leslie Liberatore, Henry Lombardi, Fara-Izarihs Maldonado, Jorge L. Maldonado, Rebecca Matchett, Christopher Matchett, Denise McGuire, Kevin McGuire, Ronald McNeese, Susan McNeese, Debra Meneese, Lori Morrison, Timothy Morrison, Delores Northington, Joseph Northington, Willie Ann Oxendine, Faina Pravin, Mary Ellen Radics, Robert Radics, Paul Reyes, Bruce Robertson, Linda Robertson, Anne Romano, Phillip Romano, Ronald Romero, Minerva Salazar, Christopher Santopietro, Linda Scherder, Neil Scherder, Ellis Smith, Susan Stark, Barbara Taylor, Julian Taylor, James Teatom, Morris Tester, Sandra Tester, Gilda Thomas, James Vette, Edward Watson, George Wilson, Allan Bellone, Kevin McGuire Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03044-NGG-MMH et al. (Relkin, Ellen)
December 9, 2022 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Sandra Tester, Morris Tester. Exactech Inc. waiver sent on 12/2/2022, answer due 1/31/2023. (Pope, N.)
December 9, 2022 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Sandra Tester, Morris Tester. Exactech U.S., Inc. waiver sent on 12/2/2022, answer due 1/31/2023. (Pope, N.)
December 9, 2022 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Sandra Tester, Morris Tester. All Plaintiffs. (Pope, N.)
December 9, 2022 Filing 7 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Sandra Tester, Morris Tester as to Exactech U.S., Inc.. (Pope, N.)
December 9, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Sandra Tester, Morris Tester as to Exactech Inc.. (Pope, N.)
November 29, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Patrice Bindel, Daniel E. Carson, Paul H. Uhle, Nue Gega, Trashe Gega, Gary J. Cheramie, Paul Dunleavy, Wendy Dunleavy, Annette Dellanno, Domenic Dellanno, Ray H. Dovell, Jr, Robert Hodge, Jr, Tammy L. Hodge, Miroslabia Perez, Betty Carol Clark, Alice Laws, Willie Laws, Richard Haunss, Joti Allen, Alison Maresca, Domenick Maresca, Diane Fassler, Jeffrey Fassler, Judy Palmer, Constance R. Furey, William P. Furey, Bjorn von Euler, Sharon von Euler, Anthony Cristiano, Kathleen Cristiano, Mary Cirrito, Michael Cirrito, Deborah McBride, Donald McBride, Jimmy Afzali, Donna M. Reyes, Richard Reilly, Lawrence Berger, Kevin G. Patterson, Carol Lappen, David Zeevalk, Dawn Zeevalk, Rosemary Proscia, Christopher Proscia, Alexander Berger, Rona Berger, Clayton Wilder, George Wilson, Valerie Wilson, Alison Gelfand, Lewis Gelfand, Stephen Decorte, Susan Decorte, Emanuel Cervelli, Robert Rhodes, Kevin Kenney, Laura Kenney, Caroline Riley, Margaret Slanovec, Joseph Centineo, Ivan Hoyos, James Obrien, Geraldine Billups, Charles M Agro, Annette Alberti, Joseph Alberti, Lawrence Batherwich, Andrew Bellian, Karen S Bellian, Allen Bellone, Lucille Bellone, Kenneth M. Bernstein, Jacob Brickman, Katherine Briscoe, Cynthia Brown, Norman Brown, James B. Burke, Brian Camp, Cynthia Camp, Laquiesha Carolina, Charles R. Cuneo, Joanne Cuneo, Lawrence Daly, Irene Danow, Keven Danow, Melissa Davis, Walton R. Diven, Jimmy Flowers, Jr, Julia Flowers, Lee Foxwell, Rex A. Foxwell, Jack Gehm, Mark Goldman, Henri Gourd, John Greene, Amedeo Guglielmo, Theresa Guglielmo, Madelon M. Gutekunst, William O. Gutekunst, Herbert Hahn, Michael Head, Ronald Hoyt, Sandra Hoyt, Debbie Insdorf, Michael A Insdorf, Belkis Jacobs, PATRICIA KREITZMAN, Robert A. Kindler, Sydney Welham Kindler, Barbara Kreitzman, Harley G. Lappen, Geraldine Larson, Joseph M. Larson, Arcangelo Liberatore, Leslie Liberatore, Henry Lombardi, Fara-Izarihs Maldonado, Jorge L. Maldonado, Rebecca Matchett, Christopher Matchett, Denise McGuire, Kevin McGuire, Ronald McNeese, Susan McNeese, Debra Meneese, Lori Morrison, Timothy Morrison, Delores Northington, Joseph Northington, Willie Ann Oxendine, Faina Pravin, Mary Ellen Radics, Robert Radics. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - CV - Kirk Pope, #2 Exhibit 2 - CV - Ellen Relkin, #3 Exhibit 3 - CV - Robert E. (Eric) Kennedy, #4 Exhibit 4 - CV - Carasusana B. Wall, #5 Exhibit 5 - CV - C. Calvin Warriner, #6 Exhibit 6 - CV - Rayna E. Kessler, #7 Exhibit 7 - CV - Joseph H. Saunders, #8 Exhibit 8 - CV - Mark P. Chalos, #9 Exhibit 9 - CV - Michael P. Cutler, #10 Exhibit 10 - CV - Maria Fleming, #11 Exhibit 11 - CV - Arati Furness, #12 Exhibit 12 - CV - Jason S. Goldstein, #13 Exhibit 13 - CV - David Harman, #14 Exhibit 14 - CV - Kristine K. Kraft, #15 Exhibit 15 - CV - Hadley E. Lundback, #16 Exhibit 16 - CV - Ben C. Martin, #17 Exhibit 17 - CV - Daniel A. Nigh, #18 Exhibit 18 - CV - Justin Presnal, #19 Exhibit 19 - CV - Patrick J. Wigle, #20 Exhibit 20 - CV - Cameron J. Falcon, #21 Exhibit 21 - CV - Kevin M. Fitzgerald, #22 Exhibit 22 - CV - Danielle Gold, #23 Exhibit 23 - CV - George E. Mclaughlin, #24 Exhibit 24 - CV - Courtney L. Mohammadi, #25 Exhibit 25 - CV - Joanna H. Oh, #26 Exhibit 26 - CV - Craig M. Silverman, #27 Exhibit 27 - CV - Ilana S. Wolk) Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03044-NGG-MMH et al. (Relkin, Ellen)
November 29, 2022 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (KD)
November 29, 2022 Filing 3 Case transferred in from District of Arkansas Eastern; Case Number 4:22-cv-01100. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
November 29, 2022 Filing 2 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-9) transferring this case to the U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of New York as part of MDL No. 3044, In Re: Exactech Polyethylene Orthopedic Products Liability Litigation. Signed by the Clerk of the Panel on 11/29/2022. (jak) [Transferred from Arkansas Eastern on 11/29/2022.]
November 29, 2022 The case of Tester et at v. Exactech Inc., has been transferred from Eastern District of Arkansas to the Eastern District of New York. The new case number is 22-cv-7222. PLEASE NOTE: if you plan to continue representing your client(s), you must be admitted to practice before this court. You must do so by applying for Pro Hac Vice or permanent admission. To apply for Pro Hac Vice admission, you must first register for an ECF login and password. Please visit the Court's website at www.nyed.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions for guidance. Once registered, you must electronically file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You must pay the required pro hac vice fee online. (KD)
November 16, 2022 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #1 Complaint. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to include the following, "Fee $402, Receipt Number LIT089046." (cmn) [Transferred from Arkansas Eastern on 11/29/2022.]
November 15, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES with Jury Demand filed by Sandra Tester and Morris Tester against Exactech Inc and Exactech US Inc. Fee $402, Receipt Number LIT089046. Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ldb) (Docket text modified on 11/16/2022 to include filing fee.)(cmn) [Transferred from Arkansas Eastern on 11/29/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tester et al v. Exactech Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Tester
Represented By: Courtney L. Mohammadi
Represented By: N. Kirkland Pope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Morris Tester
Represented By: Courtney L. Mohammadi
Represented By: N. Kirkland Pope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exactech Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exactech U.S., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?