Building Industry Electrical Contractors Association et al v. Tek et al
Plaintiff: Building Industry Electrical Contractors Association and Building Industry Fund, Inc.
Defendant: Michael Tek and Patriot Electrical Corp
Case Number: 1:2022cv07653
Filed: December 16, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Nicholas G Garaufis
Referring Judge: Robert M Levy
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 185 Labor/Mgt. Relations (Contracts)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2022 Case Randomly Assigned to Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (KD)
December 24, 2022 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Building Industry Electrical Contractors Association, Building Industry Fund, Inc.. Patriot Electrical Corp waiver sent on 12/15/2022, answer due 2/13/2023; Michael Tek waiver sent on 12/15/2022, answer due 2/13/2023. (Aljian, Thomas)
December 23, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Ana Getiashvili on behalf of Patriot Electrical Corp, Michael Tek (aty to be noticed) (Getiashvili, Ana)
December 23, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan D. Farrell on behalf of Patriot Electrical Corp, Michael Tek (aty to be noticed) (Farrell, Jonathan)
December 16, 2022 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (SR)
December 16, 2022 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (SR)
December 16, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Patriot Electrical Corp, Michael Tek filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-16235398 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -yes,, filed by Building Industry Electrical Contractors Association, Building Industry Fund, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Aljian, Thomas)
December 16, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (SR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Building Industry Electrical Contractors Association et al v. Tek et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Building Industry Electrical Contractors Association
Represented By: Thomas George Aljian, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Building Industry Fund, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas George Aljian, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Tek
Represented By: Ana Getiashvili
Represented By: Jonathan D. Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patriot Electrical Corp
Represented By: Ana Getiashvili
Represented By: Jonathan D. Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?