Palmeri v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Joseph Palmeri
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2022cv07894
Filed: December 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Diane Gujarati
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 23, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2023 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #10 Proposed Scheduling Order pursuant to Admin Order 2023-06 -- The request is granted, and the briefing schedule is amended as follows: Defendant shall file and serve the administrative record, or make a motion under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12, by April 28, 2023; Plaintiff shall file and serve a brief for the requested relief by June 27, 2023; Defendant shall file and serve its brief by August 28, 2023; and Plaintiff shall file and serve a reply brief, if any, by September 27, 2023. Ordered by Judge Diane Gujarati on 2/23/2023. (KA)
February 22, 2023 Filing 10 Proposed Scheduling Order pursuant to Admin Order 2023-06 by Social Security Administration (Zeigler, Anne)
January 4, 2023 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joseph Palmeri. Social Security Administration served on 12/30/2022, answer due 2/27/2023. (Avshalumov, Roman)
January 2, 2023 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joseph Palmeri. Social Security Administration served on 12/29/2022, answer due 2/27/2023. (Devora, Glen)
January 2, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Anne M Zeigler on behalf of Social Security Administration (aty to be noticed) (Zeigler, Anne)
December 29, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joseph Palmeri. (Devora, Glen)
December 28, 2022 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (KD)
December 28, 2022 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (KD)
December 28, 2022 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet.. by Joseph Palmeri (Pavia, Edward)
December 28, 2022 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. by Joseph Palmeri (Pavia, Edward)
December 28, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-16261704 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Joseph Palmeri. (Pavia, Edward)
December 28, 2022 Notice: Social Security Case Service. Pursuant to Rule 3 of the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions under 42 U.S.C. 405(g), the Clerk has issued a Notice of Electronic Case Filing (NEF) using the Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system, notifying the appropriate Regional Social Security Administration's Office of General Counsel and the United States Attorney's Office of the case.No summons shall issue. Social Security Administration served on 12/28/2022, answer due 2/27/2023. (KD)
December 28, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Diane Gujarati. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (KD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Palmeri v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Palmeri
Represented By: Edward J. Pavia, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION - GENERIC
Represented By: Anne M Zeigler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?