Etienne v. City of New York Department of Education
Plaintiff: Jackson Etienne
Defendant: City of New York Department of Education
Case Number: 1:2023cv00578
Filed: January 26, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Eric R Komitee
Referring Judge: Cheryl L Pollak
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2023 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM of Age Discrimination and Retaliation re #1 Complaint filed by Jackson Etienne. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-X) (VM)
March 22, 2023 Filing 13 Letter dated 3/22/2023 from Jackson Etienne to Stephen Suhovsky Esq. enclosing documents in further support of Plaintiff's case and further stating that the Plaintiff is looking forward to moving this action to trial. Plaintiff requests that this case not be dismissed. (w/o envelope enclosed) (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service Receipt) (VM)
March 20, 2023 Filing 12 First MOTION for pre motion conference re #1 Complaint Pre Motion Letter by City of New York Department of Education. (Suhovsky, Stephen)
March 17, 2023 Opinion or Order ORDER terminating #11 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim -- Pursuant to Rule III.B.1 of this Court's Individual Motion Rules and Practices, Defendant was required to request a pre-motion conference before submitting their motion to dismiss. Because Defendant failed to request a pre-motion conference, its motion is terminated. Ordered by Judge Eric R. Komitee on 3/17/2023. (copy mailed). (AG)
March 16, 2023 Filing 11 First MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by City of New York Department of Education. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memo of Law) (Suhovsky, Stephen)
March 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference is set for 4/18/2023 @ 12:15 PM before Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak. Telephone conference will proceed via AT&T conference call. Please dial 877-336-1839 at 12:15 PM. Enter Access code: 380-1746 and security code: 23-0578. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 3/6/2023. (DC)
February 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting in part #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: As set out in more detail in the attached Order, given that the issues in this case have been pending, defendant City of New York Department of Education's request for an extension of time is granted but only for 30 days. Defendant is Ordered to respond to the Complaint by March 16, 2023. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 2/15/2023. (MK)
February 14, 2023 Filing 8 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by City of New York Department of Education. (Suhovsky, Stephen)
February 14, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Matthew Suhovsky on behalf of City of New York Department of Education (aty to be noticed) (Suhovsky, Stephen)
February 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER : The Court's records reflect that the complaint in this action was filed on January 26, 2023. As explained in the attached Order, if service is not made upon the defendant by April 26, 2023, or the plaintiff fails to show good cause why such service has not been effected, the Court may dismiss the action without prejudice. For information regarding court procedures, the plaintiff may contact the Pro Se Office at the United States Courthouse by calling (718) 613-2665. So Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 2/2/2023. (MK)
January 27, 2023 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (KD)
January 26, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to City of New York Department of Education. (KD)
January 26, 2023 Filing 2 FILING FEE: $ 402.00, receipt number 100004398 (KD)
January 26, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of New York Department of Education, filed by Jackson Etienne. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (KD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Etienne v. City of New York Department of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jackson Etienne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of New York Department of Education
Represented By: Stephen Matthew Suhovsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?